EP1284211 - Motor vehicle with movable roof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Ing. h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | For all designated states Dr. Ing. h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states Dr. Ing. h.c. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porschestrasse 71287 Weissach / DE | ||
Former [2003/08] | For all designated states Dr.Ing. h.c.F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beierl, Dominik Christophstrasse 22 70825 Korntal-Münchingen / DE | [2003/08] | Application number, filing date | 02014381.4 | 28.06.2002 | [2003/08] | Priority number, date | DE20011040434 | 17.08.2001 Original published format: DE 10140434 | [2003/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1284211 | Date: | 19.02.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1284211 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | [2003/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1284211 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60J7/20 | [2003/08] | CPC: |
B60J7/205 (EP);
B60J1/183 (EP);
B60J1/1869 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/01] |
Former [2003/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Kraftfahrzeug mit einem beweglichen Dach | [2003/08] | English: | Motor vehicle with movable roof | [2003/08] | French: | Véhicule automobile avec toit amovible | [2003/08] | Examination procedure | 09.10.2003 | Examination requested [2003/50] | 26.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4445941 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 2 - column 3, line 6; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US5655331 (SCHRADER JUERGEN [DE], et al) [A] 1,4* column W *; | [A]US6254165 (NEUBRAND FRANK G [US]) [A] 1-6 * column 3, line 10 - column 5, line 25; figures 1-7 * | by applicant | DE19755254 | EP0949105 |