Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
14.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] |
05.09.2008 | (Expected) grant | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] |
03.09.2008 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
03.09.2008 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
08.07.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
21.06.2008 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
13.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] |
11.04.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 14.05.2008 [2008/20] |
11.07.2007 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
07.07.2006 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
20.07.2005 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
20.07.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
10.03.2004 | Deletion: Fee payment for extension state | |
10.03.2004 | Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state | |
14.11.2003 | Definitive list of designations | published on 02.01.2004 [2004/01] |
24.10.2003 | Request for examination filed | published on 10.12.2003 [2003/50] |
21.02.2003 | Publication of search report | published on 09.04.2003 [2003/15] |
04.01.2003 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] |