Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1284211 | Global Dossier | 08.10.2008 | B1 | EP1284211 | 09.04.2003 | A3 | EP1284211 | 19.02.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE10140434 | 17.08.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE10140434 | 27.02.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10140434 | 17.08.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50212855D1 | 20.11.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE10140434 | 17.08.2001 |