blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1289330

EP1289330 - Radio transceiver unit and a system for control and application of communications [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  09.02.2007
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip09.02.2007Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 14.03.2007  [2007/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MOTOROLA, INC.
1303 East Algonquin Road
Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US
[2003/10]
Inventor(s)01 / Nocham, Gabriela
23 Merido St.
Tel Aviv 69411 / IL
02 / Shahaf, Mark
5/5 Kakal Avenue
Ashdod 77642 / IL
03 / Carmon, Rafy
1 Dekel Street
Rishon Lezion 75676 / IL
 [2003/10]
Representative(s)McCormack, Derek James, et al
Optimus Patents Limited Grove House Lutyens Close Chineham Court
Basingstoke, Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/49]McCormack, Derek James, et al
Optimus, Grove House, Lutyens Close, Chineham Court
Basingstoke, Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB
Former [2003/10]McCormack, Derek James, et al
Motorola European Intellectual Property Operations Midpoint Alencon Link
Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB
Application number, filing date02014520.701.07.2002
[2003/10]
Priority number, dateGB2001002123601.09.2001         Original published format: GB 0121236
[2003/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1289330
Date:05.03.2003
Language:EN
[2003/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1289330
Date:02.01.2004
[2004/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.11.2003
ClassificationIPC:H04Q7/38
[2003/10]
CPC:
H04W12/02 (EP,US); H04W12/03 (EP,US); H04W12/04 (EP,US);
H04W76/14 (EP,US); H04W84/08 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2003/10]
TitleGerman:Funksende/Empfangseinheit und System für Steuerung und Anwendung von Kommunikationen[2003/10]
English:Radio transceiver unit and a system for control and application of communications[2003/10]
French:Unité émetteur-récepteur radio et système de gestion et d'application de communications[2003/10]
Examination procedure02.07.2004Examination requested  [2004/36]
13.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.05.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
02.08.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.02.2007Application withdrawn by applicant  [2007/11]
Request for further processing for:02.08.2006Request for further processing filed
02.08.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
25.08.2006Decision despatched
19.04.2005Request for further processing filed
19.04.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
02.05.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
08.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
10.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO0122755  (SIMOCO INT LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 4 * page 2, line 3 - line 8 *;
 [Y]EP1104213  (PHILIPS CORP INTELLECTUAL PTY [DE], et al) [Y] 9 * column 4, line 46 - column 5, line 5 *;
 [A]GB2357407  (INT COMPUTERS LTD [GB]) [A] 1,2,10* column W *;
 [Y]US2001009864  (SEO ONE-HYOUNG [KR]) [Y] 7,11 * page 2, column R, line 55 - page 3, column L, line 3 *;
 [Y]  - "Terrestrial Trunked Radio (TETRA); Direct Mode Operation (DMO); Part 6: Security", ETSI ETS 300 396-6, (19980403), pages 1 - 79, XP002256247 [Y] 1-19 * page 29, line 10 - line 15 * * page 29, line 32 - line 39; figure 16 * * page 30, line 42 - page 31, line 7 * * page 19, line 22 - line 32 * * page 21, line 1 - line 7; figure 9 * * page 31, line 1 - line 3 * * page 34, line 31 - line 33 * * page 35, line 4 - line 6 * * page 9, line 3 - line 6 * * page 19, line 13 - line 14 *
 [LY]  - "Terrestrial Trunked Radio (TETRA);Voice plus Data (V+D); Part 7: Security; 3 Definitions, symbols and abbreviations; 4.2 Air Interface key management mechanisms; 4.5 OTAR Protocols; A.2 OTAR PDUs", ETSI EN 300392-7 V2.1.1, XX, XX, (20010216), pages ,12 - 15,21-28,47-65,110-115, XP002224025 [LY] 1-19 * page 25, line 16 - line 19 * * page 27, line 15 - line 21; figure 14 * * page 25, line 1 - line 3 *
 [A]  - PARKINSON D W, "TETRA SECURITY", BT TECHNOLOGY JOURNAL, BT LABORATORIES, GB, (200107), vol. 19, no. 3, ISSN 1358-3948, pages 81 - 88, XP001096932 [A] 1,3,8,17-19 * column W *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1011942300054
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.