EP1378630 - Steam turbine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.05.2005 [2005/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALSTOM Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2004/14] | For all designated states ALSTOM Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2004/02] | For all designated states ALSTOM (Switzerland) Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5401 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reigl, Martin Lochmattstrasse 5b 5417 Untersiggenthal / CH | [2004/02] | Application number, filing date | 02014534.8 | 01.07.2002 | [2004/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1378630 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/08 | [2004/02] | CPC: |
F01D5/084 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/40] |
Former [2004/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Dampfturbine | [2004/02] | English: | Steam turbine | [2004/02] | French: | Turbine à vapeur | [2004/02] | Examination procedure | 08.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/18] | 16.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.08.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 23.08.2004 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPS6035103 ; | [YA]JPS58140403 ; | [X]FR897716 (VORKAUF HEINRICH) [X] 1-4,11 * page 3, line 55 * * figure 4 *; | [XY]CH308991 (SCHMALFELDT HANS [DE]) [X] 1,4,11 * page 1, line 61 - line 66 * * figures 2A-3,6,7 * [Y] 3; | [X]CH340669 (SULZER AG [CH]) [X] 1-4,11 * figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE1576975 (PRVNI BRNENSKA STROJIRNA ZD Y) [X] 1-4,11 * figure 1 *; | [X]US4405284 (ALBRECHT GUENTER [DE], et al) [X] 1,2* figures 1,3 *; | [XY]EP1076184 (ABB ALSTOM POWER CH AG [CH]) [X] 1,2,11 * column 3, line 10 - line 15 * * column 3, line 23 - line 25 * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 3 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850706), vol. 009, no. 162, Database accession no. (M - 394), & JP60035103 A 19850222 (TOSHIBA KK) [X] 1,4 * abstract * [Y] 5 | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831116), vol. 007, no. 257, Database accession no. (M - 256), & JP58140403 A 19830820 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI KK) [Y] 5 * abstract * [A] 8 |