EP1379095 - Method for controlling a data transmission in a radio communication system based on a hierachical network architecture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2005 [2005/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/02] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kroth, Norbert Carl-Von-Ossietzky Strasse 12 14471 Potsdam / DE | 02 /
Schniedenharn, Joerg An der Havelspitze 23 13587 Berlin / DE | [2004/02] | Application number, filing date | 02014722.9 | 03.07.2002 | [2004/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1379095 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38 | [2004/02] | CPC: |
H04W36/22 (EP);
H04W36/12 (EP,US);
H04W28/12 (EP);
H04W92/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2004/40] |
Former [2004/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Steuerung einer Datenübertragung in einem Funk-Kommunikationssystem mit hierarchischer Netzarchitektur | [2004/02] | English: | Method for controlling a data transmission in a radio communication system based on a hierachical network architecture | [2004/02] | French: | Procédé de contrôle d'une transmission de données dans un système de communication radio fondé sur une architecture de réseau hiérarchisé | [2004/02] | Examination procedure | 08.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/14] | 04.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.08.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 13.08.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0035226 (NOKIA NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [X] 1-13 * page 1, line 15 - page 2, line 5 * * page 10, line 6 - line 11 * * page 11, line 9 - line 15 * * page 12, line 10 - line 17 * * page 14, line 29 - page 15, line 9 *; | [X]EP1081979 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-13 * column 1, line 5 - line 31 * * column 17, line 22 - line 42 * * column 19, line 6 - line 28 * * column 20, line 36 - line 43 *; | [X]WO0176304 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-4,6,8-13 * page 2, line 7 - line 24 * * page 6, line 14 - line 25 * * page 11, line 17 - page 12, line 13 * * page 16, line 8 - line 24 * * page 18, line 24 - page 19, line 19 * * page 20, line 13 - page 21, line 8 ** page 22, line 8 - line 10 * |