EP1275363 - Elevation chair [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Komura Corporation 3-9, Nishiyuge Yao-shi Osaka / JP | [2007/35] |
Former [2003/03] | For all designated states Komura Corporation 3-9, Nishiyuge Yao-shi, Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Komura, Seiichi 4-1-23, Tezukayamanaka, Sumiyoshi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Kaneda, Takashi c/o Komura Corporation, 3-9, Nishiyuge Yao-shi, Osaka / JP | 03 /
Yamashita, Katuhiko c/o Komura Corporation, 3-9, Nishiyuge Yao-shi, Osaka / JP | 04 /
Adachi, Kazuya c/o Komura Corporation, 3-9, Nishiyuge Yao-shi, Osaka / JP | 05 /
Mizuseki, Isamu c/o Komura Corporation, 3-9, Nishiyuge Yao-shi, Osaka / JP | [2003/03] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/03] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02014944.9 | 08.07.2002 | [2003/03] | Priority number, date | JP20010210213 | 11.07.2001 Original published format: JP 2001210213 | [2003/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1275363 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1275363 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | [2003/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1275363 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61G5/14, A61G7/10 | [2003/14] | CPC: |
A61G7/1019 (EP,US);
A61G5/125 (EP,US);
A61G5/14 (EP,US);
A61G7/1046 (EP,US);
A61G7/1063 (EP,US);
A61G7/1074 (EP,US);
A61G7/1088 (EP,US);
A61G7/1094 (EP,US);
A61G7/1098 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/03] | A61G5/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/01] |
Former [2003/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Hebestuhl | [2003/03] | English: | Elevation chair | [2003/03] | French: | Fauteuil élévateur | [2003/03] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/33] | 23.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05023972.2 / EP1623691 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2519861 (FRALCH [FR]) [A] 1,6 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]GB2135183 (NAT RES DEV) [A] 1,6 * abstract *; | [A]US5090072 (GRAY IRWIN [US]) [A] 1,6 * abstract *; | [A]DE4304519 (KFB KAROSSERIE UND FAHRZEUGBAU [DE]) [A] 1,6 * abstract *; | [A]GB2289457 (ARJO LTD [GB]) [A] 12 * page 6, line 19 - line 26; figure 3 *; | [A]GB2325899 (HESTER ROBERT GEORGE [GB]) [A] 14-16* page 6, line 13 - page 7, line 1; figure 3 * |