Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
14.09.2009 | Change - representative | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] |
17.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.02.2005 [2005/05] |
05.10.2004 | Deletion: Fee payment for extension state | |
05.10.2004 | Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state | |
31.08.2004 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
18.08.2004 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
11.06.2004 | Definitive list of designations | published on 28.07.2004 [2004/31] |
04.06.2004 | New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit | |
04.06.2004 | New entry: Period of grace R.85b EPC 1973: despatch of communication + time limit | |
19.09.2003 | Publication of search report | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] |
13.12.2002 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.01.2003 [2003/05] |