EP1380963 - A method and computer based system for displaying of time variant tabular data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.09.2018 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 31.10.2018 [2018/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAP SE Dietmar-Hopp-Allee 16 69190 Walldorf / DE | [2014/43] |
Former [2005/44] | For all designated states SAP AG Dietmar-Hopp-Allee 16 69190 Walldorf / DE | ||
Former [2004/03] | For all designated states SAP Aktiengesellschaft Neurottstrasse 16 69190 Walldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Merkel, Michael Schriesheimer Strasse 16 68549 Ilvesheim / DE | 02 /
Meessen, Marlies Königsberger Strasse 48 69181 Leimen / DE | [2004/03] | Representative(s) | Richardt Patentanwälte PartG mbB Wilhelmstraße 7 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/10] | Richardt Patentanwälte Wilhelmstraße 7 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2011/10] | Richardt, Markus Albert, et al Richardt Patents Trademarks Wilhelmstraße 7 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2005/09] | Richardt, Markus Albert, Dipl.-Ing., et al Leergasse 11 65343 Eltville / DE | ||
Former [2004/03] | Richardt, Markus Albert, et al Quermann & Richardt Patentanwälte Unter den Eichen 7 D-65195 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 02015347.4 | 10.07.2002 | [2004/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1380963 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/24, G06F17/18 | [2004/03] | CPC: |
G06F17/18 (EP,US);
G06F40/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/03] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Rechnergestütztes System zur Darstellung zeitinvariantes von zeitinvarianten Daten in Tabellenform | [2004/03] | English: | A method and computer based system for displaying of time variant tabular data | [2004/03] | French: | Méthode et système basé sur ordinateur pour afficher de données tabulaires qui ne variant pas dans le temps | [2004/03] | Examination procedure | 12.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/33] | 26.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.04.2012 | 19.04.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 23.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.12.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/44] | 17.12.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 07.06.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/44] | Appeal following examination | 17.01.2014 | Appeal received No. T0995/14 | 07.03.2014 | Statement of grounds filed | 07.06.2018 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 07.06.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.06.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.01.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search | Examination | US5440730 | - TANSEL A U ET AL, Temporal Databases - Theory, Design, and Implementation, BENJAMIN/CUMMINGS PUBLISHING COMPANY, (1993), XP055024641 | - DUMAS M ET AL, "Pointwise Temporal Object Database Browsing", Objects and Databases, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, (2001), vol. 1944, pages 170 - 184, doi:10.1007/3-540-44677-X_12, ISBN 978-3-54-041664-7, XP055024303 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/3-540-44677-X_12 | by applicant | US5317306 |