EP1277688 - Brush brake ring [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IROPA AG Oberneuhofstrasse 6 6340 Baar / CH | [2003/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maffeo, Andrea Cascina Prona 42 13881 Cavaglià / IT | [2003/04] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/04] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02015674.1 | 17.07.2002 | [2003/04] | Priority number, date | DE2001135628 | 20.07.2001 Original published format: DE 10135628 | [2003/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1277688 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1277688 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | [2003/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1277688 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B65H51/22 | [2003/04] | CPC: |
D03D47/365 (EP);
D04B15/484 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, IT, LI, TR [2004/02] |
Former [2003/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Borstenbremsring | [2003/04] | English: | Brush brake ring | [2003/04] | French: | Anneau de freinage à brosses | [2003/04] | Examination procedure | 15.10.2003 | Examination requested [2003/50] | 17.10.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.02.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK | 16.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.11.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.11.2003 | SK   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | TR | 05.10.2005 | [2008/38] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3701244 (DISMON PETER, et al) [A] 1-3,5 * column 4, line 22 - line 43; figure 1 *; | [AD]DE2555802 (LAWSON HEMPHILL); | [A]EP0049896 (ROY ELECTROTEX SPA [IT]); | [A]EP0483505 (SOBREVIN [LI]); | [A]WO9920557 (ROJ ELECTROTEX NUOVA SRL [IT], et al) |