Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003054244 | Global Dossier | 26.02.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2001242673 | 09.08.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1283118 | Global Dossier | 24.11.2004 | B1 | EP1283118 | 07.01.2004 | A3 | EP1283118 | 12.02.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2001242673 | 09.08.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60202025T | 01.12.2005 | T2 | DE60202025D1 | 30.12.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001242673 | 09.08.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6761214 | 13.07.2004 | B2 | US2003029609 | 13.02.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2001242673 | 09.08.2001 |