EP1282077 - Moving object detecting method, apparatus, and computer program product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.06.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2003/06] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujii, Hirofumi 749-11, Saedo-cho, Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [2003/06] | Representative(s) | Balsters, Robert, et al Novagraaf International S.A. Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/06] | Balsters, Robert, et al Novagraaf International S.A. 25, avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 02016243.4 | 22.07.2002 | [2003/06] | Priority number, date | JP20010232667 | 31.07.2001 Original published format: JP 2001232667 | [2003/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1282077 | Date: | 05.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1282077 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | [2011/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/20 | [2003/06] | CPC: |
G06T7/223 (EP,US);
G06T7/215 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10016 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Detektion eines sich bewegenden Objektes, und Rechnerprogramm | [2003/06] | English: | Moving object detecting method, apparatus, and computer program product | [2003/06] | French: | Méthode et appareil de détection d'objet en mouvement et programme informatique | [2003/06] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6014181 (SUN KAI [US]) [A] 1-25 * abstract *; | [A]WO0070879 (ST MICROELECTRONICS ASIA [SG], et al) [A] 1-25 * abstract *; | [A]US2001008545 (TAKEDA HIDEKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-25* abstract * |