EP1284098 - Agricultural harvesting machine with axial flow separator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CLAAS Selbstfahrende Erntemaschinen GmbH Münsterstrasse 33 33428 Harsewinkel / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/47] | For all designated states CLAAS Selbstfahrende Erntemaschinen GmbH Münsterstrasse 33 33428 Harsewinkel / DE | ||
Former [2003/08] | For all designated states CLAAS Selbstfahrende Erntemaschinen GmbH Münsterstr. 33 33428 Harsewinkel / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwersmann, Berthold Scheventorf 68 49186 Bad Iburg / DE | 02 /
Gogolin, Gregor Gittruper Strasse 29 48157 Münster / DE | [2003/08] | Application number, filing date | 02016682.3 | 26.07.2002 | [2003/08] | Priority number, date | DE2001139539 | 10.08.2001 Original published format: DE 10139539 | [2003/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1284098 | Date: | 19.02.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1284098 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A01F7/06 | [2003/08] | CPC: |
A01F12/442 (EP,US);
A01F7/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/08] | Title | German: | Landwirtschaftliche Erntemaschine mit Axialtrennvorrichtung | [2003/08] | English: | Agricultural harvesting machine with axial flow separator | [2003/08] | French: | Récolteuse à dispositif séparateur à écoulement axial | [2003/08] | Examination procedure | 19.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/44] | 05.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 22.11.2006 | CZ | 22.11.2006 | EE | 22.11.2006 | FI | 22.11.2006 | GB | 22.11.2006 | IE | 22.11.2006 | NL | 22.11.2006 | SK | 22.11.2006 | TR | 22.11.2006 | BG | 22.02.2007 | SE | 22.02.2007 | GR | 23.02.2007 | ES | 05.03.2007 | PT | 23.04.2007 | AT | 26.07.2007 | LU | 26.07.2007 | CH | 31.07.2007 | LI | 31.07.2007 | MC | 31.07.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | CY | 22.11.2006 | |
CZ | 22.11.2006 | ||
EE | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
GB | 22.11.2006 | ||
IE | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
SK | 22.11.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
GR | 23.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
AT | 26.07.2007 | ||
LU | 26.07.2007 | ||
CH | 31.07.2007 | ||
LI | 31.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | CZ | 22.11.2006 | |
EE | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
GB | 22.11.2006 | ||
IE | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
SK | 22.11.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
GR | 23.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
AT | 26.07.2007 | ||
CH | 31.07.2007 | ||
LI | 31.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/50] | CZ | 22.11.2006 | |
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
GB | 22.11.2006 | ||
IE | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
SK | 22.11.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
GR | 23.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
AT | 26.07.2007 | ||
CH | 31.07.2007 | ||
LI | 31.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CZ | 22.11.2006 | |
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
GB | 22.11.2006 | ||
IE | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
SK | 22.11.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
GR | 23.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
CH | 31.07.2007 | ||
LI | 31.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | CZ | 22.11.2006 | |
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
GB | 22.11.2006 | ||
IE | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
SK | 22.11.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
GR | 23.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | CZ | 22.11.2006 | |
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
GB | 22.11.2006 | ||
IE | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
SK | 22.11.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
GR | 23.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | CZ | 22.11.2006 | |
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
GB | 22.11.2006 | ||
IE | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
SK | 22.11.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | CZ | 22.11.2006 | |
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
IE | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
SK | 22.11.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/42] | CZ | 22.11.2006 | |
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
IE | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | CZ | 22.11.2006 | |
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | CZ | 22.11.2006 | |
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | FI | 22.11.2006 | |
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 22.11.2006 | |
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4222395 (JOHNSTON DAVID K, et al); | [A]GB2053644 (WITZEL H D); | [A]EP0281383 (DEERE & CO [US]) [A] 1,3 * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 28 * * column 6, line 17 - line 59 * * column 7, line 3 - line 45 *; | [DA]US4869272 (RICKETTS JON E [US], et al); | [A]US5334093 (JENSEN RODERICK J [US], et al) [A] 1-3,5 * column 5, line 15 - line 68 * * column 7, line 19 - line 68 * * figures 2,6,8 *; | [DA]US5454758 (TOPHINKE FRANZ [DE], et al) |