EP1279992 - Lens to be built in into a spectacle frame [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.06.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.07.2007 [2007/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eschenbach Optik GmbH + Co. Schopenhauerstrasse 10 90409 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/05] | For all designated states ESCHENBACH OPTIK GmbH + Co. Schopenhauerstrasse 10 90409 Nürnberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Henkelmann, Klaus Schumacherring 98 90552 Röthenbach / DE | 02 /
Kohl, Peter Magnolienstrasse 2 90522 Oberasbach / DE | [2003/05] | Representative(s) | Mörtel & Höfner Patentanwälte Äussere Sulzbacher Strasse 159/161 90491 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/05] | Mörtel & Höfner Patentanwälte Blumenstrasse 1 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 02016750.8 | 26.07.2002 | [2003/05] | Priority number, date | DE2001136954 | 28.07.2001 Original published format: DE 10136954 | [2003/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1279992 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1279992 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | [2004/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G02C7/02, G02B5/18, G02B3/08 | [2004/49] | CPC: |
G02C7/02 (EP);
G02B5/1895 (EP);
G02C2202/20 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2003/05] | G02C7/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/05] | Title | German: | Linse zum Einbau in eine Brillenfassung | [2003/05] | English: | Lens to be built in into a spectacle frame | [2003/05] | French: | Lentille à être incorporée dans une monture de lunettes | [2003/05] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/22] | 10.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/27] | 14.02.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0435525 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1-5,9,10 * column 4, line 16 - line 35 * * column 6, line 12 - line 27 * [Y] 1-7,10; | [XY]WO9710527 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [X] 1-5,9,10 * page 10, line 4 - page 11, line 3; figures 6-8 * [Y] 1-7,9,10; | [Y]EP1072906 (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 1-7,9,10 * column 13, line 57 - column 16, line 16; figures 4-8,12,13 *; | [Y]US5715091 (MEYERS MARK M [US]) [Y] 6,7 * column 4, line 56 - column 6, line 23; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0927905 (MOUFLIN MONIQUE [FR]) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]US2092789 (TILLYER EDGAR D) [A] 1,2,6,9,10 * page 1, column R, line 39 - line 52 *; | [A]DE212572 (DR. HEINRICH SCHOELER) [A] 1,2 * page 1, line 20 - line 48; figure 3 * |