EP1284199 - Ink-jet recording medium and ink-jet image forming method using the recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP | [2006/35] |
Former [2003/08] | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohya, Hidenobu c/o Konica Corporation, 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi, Tokyo, 191-8511 / JP | 02 /
Kida, Shuji c/o Konica Corporation, 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi, Tokyo, 191-8511 / JP | 03 /
Suzuki, Shinichi c/o Konica Corporation, 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi, Tokyo, 191-8511 / JP | 04 /
Kaga, Makoto c/o Konica Corporation, 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi, Tokyo, 191-8511 / JP | 05 /
Fukuda, Teruyuki c/o Konica Corporation, 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi, Tokyo, 191-8511 / JP | [2003/08] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/08] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 02016896.9 | 31.07.2002 | [2003/08] | Priority number, date | JP20010240511 | 08.08.2001 Original published format: JP 2001240511 | [2003/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1284199 | Date: | 19.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1284199 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | [2003/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1284199 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/00, B41M7/00 | [2003/08] | CPC: |
B41M5/52 (EP,US);
B41M7/009 (EP,US);
B41M5/502 (EP,US);
B41M5/506 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24802 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/01] |
Former [2003/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | TIntenstrahldruckaufzeichnungsmedium und Bildaufzeichnungsverfahren damit | [2003/08] | English: | Ink-jet recording medium and ink-jet image forming method using the recording medium | [2003/08] | French: | Support pour impression par jet d'encre et méthode d'impression à l'aide de ce dernier | [2003/08] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/45] | 15.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS59222381 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * the whole document *; | [X]EP0411638 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-10 * figure 1 * * page 2, line 52 - page 3, line 2 * * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 16 * * example 1 *; | [X]JPH0596844 (OJI PAPER CO) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0756941 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-10 * page 2, line 33 - line 54 * * page 3, line 24 - line 46 * * page 4, line 9 - line 17 * * examples 1-3 *; | [X]EP0858907 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-13 * page 3, line 1 - line 6 * * page 3, line 33 - line 35 * * page 4, line 30 - line 56 * * page 5, line 3 - page 6, line 1 * * figure 6 * * example 1 * * comparative example 1 *; | [X]EP0934905 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-10 * figure 7 * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0041] * * examples 2,4,6 *; | [A]EP1002660 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [A] 6* paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0071] * | by applicant | JPS6110483 | JPS61237681 | JPS63309797 | JPH01206088 | JPH0231673 | JPH07237248 | JP2000203151 | JP2000280603 |