EP1281355 - Tissue opening occluder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ev3 Inc. 1861 Buerkle Road White Bear Lake, Minnesota 55110-5246 / US | [2005/38] |
Former [2003/20] | For all designated states ev3 Inc. 1861 Buerkle Road White Bear Lake Minnesota 55110 / US | ||
Former [2003/06] | For all designated states MICROVENA CORPORATION 1861 Buerkle Road White Bear Lake, MN 55110-5246 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thill, Gary A. 3741 Centerville Road Vadnais Heights, MN 55127 / US | 02 /
Young, Michelle M. 18020 Fillmore Street N.E. Ham Lage, MN 55304 / US | 03 /
Oman, Jana F. 1101 81st Avenue N.E. Spring Lake Park, MN 55432 / US | 04 /
Barratt, Paul R. 3229 South 46th Avenue Minneapolis, MN 55406 / US | [2003/06] | Representative(s) | Kirschner, Klaus Dieter Puschmann Borchert Bardehle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 10 12 31 80086 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/06] | Kirschner, Klaus Dieter, Dipl.-Phys. Schneiders & Behrendt Rechtsanwälte - Patentanwälte Sollner Strasse 38 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02016922.3 | 31.07.2002 | [2003/06] | Priority number, date | US20010309376P | 01.08.2001 Original published format: US 309376 P | US20010309418P | 01.08.2001 Original published format: US 309418 P | US20010309337P | 01.08.2001 Original published format: US 309337 P | US20020209797 | 30.07.2002 Original published format: US 209797 | [2003/10] |
Former [2003/06] | US20010309376P | 01.08.2001 | |
US20010309418P | 01.08.2001 | ||
US20010309337P | 01.08.2001 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1281355 | Date: | 05.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1281355 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | [2003/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1281355 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/38] |
Former [2003/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | |
No.: | EP1281355 | ||
Date: | |||
Status: | (deleted) | ||
[2003/10] | |||
[2003/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00 | [2003/06] | CPC: |
A61B17/0057 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00575 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00592 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00597 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00615 (EP,US);
A61B90/39 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/06] | Title | German: | Okklusionsvorrichtung | [2003/06] | English: | Tissue opening occluder | [2003/06] | French: | Dispositif d'occlusion | [2003/06] | Examination procedure | 27.08.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/44] | 25.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 20.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05108257.6 / EP1602332 | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/35] | Request for further processing for: | 20.12.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 20.12.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.01.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.09.2005 | BE | 21.09.2005 | CH | 21.09.2005 | CY | 21.09.2005 | CZ | 21.09.2005 | EE | 21.09.2005 | FI | 21.09.2005 | LI | 21.09.2005 | SK | 21.09.2005 | TR | 21.09.2005 | BG | 21.12.2005 | DK | 21.12.2005 | GR | 21.12.2005 | SE | 21.12.2005 | ES | 01.01.2006 | PT | 21.02.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/38] | AT | 21.09.2005 | |
BE | 21.09.2005 | ||
CH | 21.09.2005 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2005 | ||
EE | 21.09.2005 | ||
FI | 21.09.2005 | ||
LI | 21.09.2005 | ||
SK | 21.09.2005 | ||
TR | 21.09.2005 | ||
BG | 21.12.2005 | ||
DK | 21.12.2005 | ||
GR | 21.12.2005 | ||
SE | 21.12.2005 | ||
ES | 01.01.2006 | ||
PT | 21.02.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 21.09.2005 | |
BE | 21.09.2005 | ||
CH | 21.09.2005 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2005 | ||
EE | 21.09.2005 | ||
FI | 21.09.2005 | ||
LI | 21.09.2005 | ||
SK | 21.09.2005 | ||
BG | 21.12.2005 | ||
DK | 21.12.2005 | ||
GR | 21.12.2005 | ||
SE | 21.12.2005 | ||
ES | 01.01.2006 | ||
PT | 21.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 21.09.2005 | |
BE | 21.09.2005 | ||
CH | 21.09.2005 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2005 | ||
FI | 21.09.2005 | ||
LI | 21.09.2005 | ||
SK | 21.09.2005 | ||
BG | 21.12.2005 | ||
DK | 21.12.2005 | ||
GR | 21.12.2005 | ||
SE | 21.12.2005 | ||
ES | 01.01.2006 | ||
PT | 21.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | BE | 21.09.2005 | |
CH | 21.09.2005 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2005 | ||
FI | 21.09.2005 | ||
LI | 21.09.2005 | ||
SK | 21.09.2005 | ||
BG | 21.12.2005 | ||
GR | 21.12.2005 | ||
SE | 21.12.2005 | ||
ES | 01.01.2006 | ||
PT | 21.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/29] | BE | 21.09.2005 | |
CH | 21.09.2005 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2005 | ||
FI | 21.09.2005 | ||
LI | 21.09.2005 | ||
SK | 21.09.2005 | ||
BG | 21.12.2005 | ||
GR | 21.12.2005 | ||
SE | 21.12.2005 | ||
PT | 21.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | BE | 21.09.2005 | |
CH | 21.09.2005 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2005 | ||
FI | 21.09.2005 | ||
LI | 21.09.2005 | ||
BG | 21.12.2005 | ||
GR | 21.12.2005 | ||
SE | 21.12.2005 | ||
PT | 21.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | BE | 21.09.2005 | |
CH | 21.09.2005 | ||
FI | 21.09.2005 | ||
LI | 21.09.2005 | ||
BG | 21.12.2005 | ||
GR | 21.12.2005 | ||
SE | 21.12.2005 | ||
PT | 21.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/14] | CH | 21.09.2005 | |
FI | 21.09.2005 | ||
LI | 21.09.2005 | ||
BG | 21.12.2005 | ||
GR | 21.12.2005 | ||
SE | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 21.09.2005 | |
BG | 21.12.2005 | ||
SE | 21.12.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0474887 (INOUE KANJI [JP]) [X] 1-3,8,10 * column 3, line 16 - line 36 * * column 5, line 26 - column 6, line 20 * * figures 2,5-11 *; | [X]US5284488 (SIDERIS ELEFTHERIOS B [US]) [X] 1-3,6,8,9 * column 4, line 49 - column 5, line 43 * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]EP1046375 (NISSHO KK [JP]) [X] 1-4,7,10 * figures 1-3 * * column 3, line 21 - column 4, line 31 *; | [X]US6152144 (LESH MICHAEL D [US], et al) [X] 11-24,26,28 * column 7, line 31 - column 8, line 28 * * figures 1-5 *; | [X]WO0130267 (ATRITECH INC [US]) [X] 11-28 * page 31, line 7 - line 25 * * page 32, line 7 - line 21 * * page 37, line 21 - page 38, line 20 ** figures 37,41-43,57-60 * | by applicant | US6214029 | US2001037129 | US6427413 |