EP1295691 - Plant for producing vapour-hardened building materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.04.2005 [2005/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xella Porenbeton AG Hornstrasse 3 D-80797 München / DE | [2003/36] |
Former [2003/13] | For all designated states YTONG AG Hornstrasse 3 D-80797 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dr. Dieter Hums Ferdinand-Zink-Str. 1 86529 Schrobenhausen / DE | 02 /
Guido Bailleul Tirien F- 38510 Courtenay / FR | 03 /
Peter Bayer Hochfeldstr.14 86561 Rettenbach / DE | [2003/18] | Representative(s) | Dr. Solf & Zapf Patent- und Rechtsanwalts PartG mbB Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/13] | Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02017298.7 | 25.04.1997 | [2003/13] | Priority number, date | DE19961027019 | 04.07.1996 Original published format: DE 19627019 | [2003/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1295691 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1295691 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | [2003/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1295691 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B28B15/00, B28B1/50, B28B11/24 | [2003/13] | CPC: |
B28B15/00 (EP);
B28B1/50 (EP);
B28B11/245 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2003/13] | Title | German: | Anlage zum Herstellen von dampfgehärteten Baustoffen | [2003/13] | English: | Plant for producing vapour-hardened building materials | [2003/13] | French: | Dispositif pour produire des matériaux de construction étuvés | [2003/13] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2002 | Examination requested [2003/13] | 22.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97921783.3 / EP0918604 | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]BE556531 (INTERSILICOL S.A. HOLDING) [A] 1,3 * page 4, line 8 - page 4, line 34 * * page 5, line 18 - page 6, line 18 *; | [A]CH281682 (MESSERSCHMITT WILLY DR ING [DE], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR1360763 (R. MICIAN) [A] 1-3 * the whole document * * page 2, column 2, line 33 - page 2, column 2, line 44 *; | [A]DE3015245 (PFISTER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * page 8, line 11 - page 10, line 19 ** claims 1-5 * |