09.01.2009 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 11.02.2009 [2009/07] |
10.10.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] |
01.02.2008 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 05.03.2008 [2008/10] |
01.02.2008 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.03.2008 [2008/10] |
01.02.2008 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.03.2008 [2008/10] |
22.12.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
22.12.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
08.09.2007 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
08.09.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.09.2007 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.07.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.05.2007 |
Change: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
23.05.2007 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
09.03.2007 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 11.04.2007 [2007/15] |
07.03.2007 |
New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
23.02.2007 |
First examination report |
|
20.02.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.12.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.01.2007 [2007/03] |
14.12.2006 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
01.09.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.07.2006 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] |
07.07.2006 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] |
30.06.2006 |
Publication of search report |
published on 02.08.2006 [2006/31] |
30.06.2006 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.08.2006 [2006/31] |
01.09.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.09.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.02.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.03.2003 [2003/13] |