Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3993050B | Global Dossier | 17.10.2007 | B2 | JP2003202058 | 18.07.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | DE10146386 | 20.09.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1296440 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2008 | B1 | EP1296440 | 02.08.2006 | A3 | EP1296440 | 26.03.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE10146386 | 20.09.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE388515T | 15.03.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE10146386 | 20.09.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE10146386 | 17.04.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10146386 | 20.09.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50211818D1 | 17.04.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE10146386 | 20.09.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6849017 | 01.02.2005 | B2 | US2003054910 | 20.03.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10146386 | 20.09.2001 |