EP1288192 - Process for preparing 1-amino-4-hydroxyanthraquinones [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2008 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 25.06.2008 [2008/26] | 23.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.06.2008 [2008/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LANXESS Deutschland GmbH 51369 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/29] | For all designated states LANXESS Deutschland GmbH 51369 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [2005/28] | For all designated states LANXESS Deutschland GmbH 51369 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states Bayer Chemicals AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [2003/10] | For all designated states Bayer Aktiengesellschaft 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thiebes, Christoph, Dr. Hansaring 93 50670 Köln / DE | 02 /
Stawitz, Josef-Walter, Dr. Im Hagen 1 51519 Odenthal / DE | [2003/10] | Application number, filing date | 02017673.1 | 07.08.2002 | [2003/10] | Priority number, date | DE2001140107 | 16.08.2001 Original published format: DE 10140107 | [2003/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1288192 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1288192 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07C227/06, C07C229/50, C09B1/514 | [2003/10] | CPC: |
C09B1/5145 (EP,US);
C07C221/00 (EP,US);
C07C231/12 (EP,US);
C07C2603/24 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C221/00, C07C225/36 (EP,US);
C07C231/12, C07C233/43 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | CH, CZ, DE, FR, GB, LI [2003/48] |
Former [2003/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 1-Amino-4-hydroxyanthrachinonen | [2003/10] | English: | Process for preparing 1-amino-4-hydroxyanthraquinones | [2003/10] | French: | Procédé de préparation de 1-amino-4-hydroxyanthraquinones | [2003/10] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/45] | 21.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 18.07.2007 | [2008/26] | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US1931264 (MEULY WALTER C) [DA] 1-6* example -; claim - *; | [DA]US2419405 (KLEIN DAVID X) [DA] 1-6 * example -; claim - *; | [XA]CH391930 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 7 * page 3, paragraph 1; example 4; claim - * * example - * [A] 1-6; | [DA]CH1337167 (TOMS RIVER CHEMICAL CO.) [DA] 1-7 *das ganze Dokument*; | [A]DE2041374 (BASF AG) [A] 1-7 *das ganze Dokument* |