EP1381043 - Transfer apparatus for digital image data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.09.2005 [2005/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chang, Cheng-Chun 11F-2, No. 11, Lane 202, ,Jing-Shing Road Wen-Shan DT Taipei / TW | [N/P] |
Former [2004/03] | For all designated states Chang, Cheng-Chun 11F-2, No. 11, Lane 202, ,Jing-Shing Road Wen-Shan DT, Taipei / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/03] | Representative(s) | Helms, Joachim Patentanwalt Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/03] | Helms, Joachim, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Dantestrasse 27 80637 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02017725.9 | 08.08.2002 | [2004/03] | Priority number, date | CN2002141194 | 08.07.2002 Original published format: CN 02141194 | [2004/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1381043 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1381043 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | [2004/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G11B19/00, G11B7/00, G11B33/00 | [2004/17] | CPC: |
G11B7/0037 (EP);
G11B19/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/03] | G11B19/00, G11B7/00, G11B7/28 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/10] |
Former [2004/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Gerät zum Überschreiben von digitalen Bilddaten | [2004/03] | English: | Transfer apparatus for digital image data | [2004/03] | French: | Appareil de transfer des données d'image digitales | [2004/03] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/36] | 07.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/36] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.01.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 24.01.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2001332018 ; | [XA]JPH1166736 ; | [Y]JP2001283521 ; | [A]JP2000341629 ; | [A]US5963530 (WARD VERA [US]) [A] 9-11 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6304920 (KOBAYASHI KAZUO [JP], et al) [Y] 8 * abstract * * column 3, line 8 - line 40 * * column 6, line 25 - line 32 * * column 6, line 58 - line 65 *; | [Y]EP1152426 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 2 * abstract *; | [Y]TW493787U (CHANG CHENG-CHUN [TW]) [Y] 5,9-17 * figure - *; | US2002120877 [ ] (CHANG CHENG-CHUN [TW]) [ ] * the whole document * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020403), vol. 2002, no. 03, & JP2001332018 A 20011130 (SONY CORP) [X] 1,4,6,7 * abstract * [Y] 2,3,5,8-17 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990630), vol. 1999, no. 08, & JP11066736 A 19990309 (HITACHI LTD;HITACHI VIDEO IND INF SYST INC) [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-17 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020402), vol. 2002, no. 02, & JP2001283521 A 20011012 (AIWA CO LTD) [Y] 3 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010406), vol. 2000, no. 15, & JP2000341629 A 20001208 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO LTD) [A] 1-17 * abstract * |