EP1391470 - Process for preparing polymer compound for resist [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.09.2008 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUN EI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 700, Shukuoorui-machi Takasaki-shi Gunma-ken 370 / JP | [2007/44] |
Former [2004/09] | For all designated states GUN EI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 700, Shukuoorui-machi Takasaki-shi, Gunma-ken 370 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maruyama, Katsuhiro GUN EI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD., 700 Shukuoorui machi, Takasaki-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | 02 /
Yoshida, Satoru GUN EI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD., 700 Shukuoorui machi, Takasaki-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | 03 /
Kitano, Satoru GUN EI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD., 700 Shukuoorui machi, Takasaki-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | 04 /
Mashio, Hitoshi GUN EI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD., 700 Shukuoorui machi, Takasaki-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | [2004/09] | Representative(s) | Munk, Ludwig Patentanwälte Munk Prinzregentenstrasse 3 86150 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/09] | Munk, Ludwig, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Prinzregentenstrasse 1 86150 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 02018007.1 | 12.08.2002 | [2004/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1391470 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1391470 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C08F12/22, G03F7/039 | [2004/09] | CPC: |
C08F12/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2004/47] |
Former [2004/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Polymeren für Resist | [2004/09] | English: | Process for preparing polymer compound for resist | [2004/09] | French: | Procédé de préparation de polymères pour photoréserve | [2004/09] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/22] | 26.08.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.12.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | 14.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.09.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.09.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0277721 (HOECHST CELANESE CORP [US]); | [A]EP0466359 (HOECHST CELANESE CORP [US]) |