EP1293573 - Process for producing a marker-vaccine against a mammalian virus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maltagen Forschung GmbH Schaarstrasse 1 86626 Andernach / DE | [2003/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stahl, Rainer Antoniterstrasse 65 53179 Bonn / DE | 02 /
Nelsen-Salz, Birgit, Dr. Robert-Blum-Strasse 11 50935 Köln / DE | 03 /
Wolf, Norbert, Dr. Wachtburgstrasse 8 56626 Andernach / DE | [2004/35] |
Former [2003/12] | 01 /
Stahl, Rainer Antoniterstrasse 65 53179 Bonn / DE | ||
02 /
Nelsen-Salz, Birgit, Dr. Wiethasestrasse 67 50933 Köln / DE | |||
03 /
Wolf, Norbert, Dr. Wachtburgstrasse 8 56626 Andernach / DE | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2004/35] | Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2003/12] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02018214.3 | 20.08.2002 | [2003/12] | Priority number, date | DE2001145969 | 18.09.2001 Original published format: DE 10145969 | [2003/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1293573 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1293573 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | [2003/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/82, A01H5/00, C07K14/18 | [2003/12] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
A61P31/12 (EP);
C12N15/8258 (EP,US);
C12N2770/24322 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Markerimpfstoffs gegen ein Säugervirus | [2003/12] | English: | Process for producing a marker-vaccine against a mammalian virus | [2003/12] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication d'un vaccin marqueur contre un virus de mammifère | [2003/12] | Examination procedure | 20.08.2002 | Examination requested [2003/12] | 13.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 24.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/16] | 26.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9710347 (HOWARD JOHN A [US]) [X] 1-5,7-12,14-18 * page 6, line 31 * * page 22, line 22 - line 36; examples 1-7 * * the whole document *; | [X]WO0037610 (THOMPSON BOYCE PLANT RES [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-11,14-18 * page 19; figure 3; table 1 *; | [A] - DE SMIT A J, "Laboratory diagnosis, epizootiology, and efficacy of marker vaccines in classical swine fever: A review", VETERINARY QUARTERLY, (200010), vol. 22, no. 4, ISSN 0165-2176, pages 182 - 188, XP009019420 |