EP1389633 - Improved thermoplastic hydrophilic adhesive compositions for dry and wet surfaces the compositions having an increased water adhesion stability [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.04.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.05.2012 [2012/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/08] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bonfanti, Lidia Via Lago di Como, 6 65015 Montesilvano (Pescara) / IT | 02 /
Corzani, Italo Via R. Cocchia, 40 66100 Chieti / IT | 03 /
Lunetto, Pietro Via Aldo Moro, 74 65024 Manopello Scalo / IT | 04 /
Marchesini, Maurizio Avenue des Eperons d'Or, 1 1050 Brussels / BE | [2004/08] | Representative(s) | Hampton, Matthew John, et al Hoyng Rokh Monegier LLP Rembrandt Tower, 31st Floor Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/10] | Hampton, Matthew John, et al Hoyng Monegier LLP Rembrandt Tower, 31st Floor Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2007/43] | Hampton, Matthew John, et al Howrey LLP PO Box 94361 1090 GJ Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2004/08] | Veronese, Pancrazio, et al Procter & Gamble Italia S.p.A. Italian Research Center Via Aterno 92/94 66020 Sambuceto di San Giovanni Teatino (Chieti) / IT | Application number, filing date | 02018338.0 | 14.08.2002 | [2004/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1389633 | Date: | 18.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C09J175/04, C08L75/00, C08L67/00, C08L33/00 | [2004/08] | CPC: |
C09J131/04 (EP,US);
C09J133/08 (EP,US);
C09J139/06 (EP,US);
C09J167/00 (EP,US);
C09J201/02 (EP,US);
C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L2666/20 (EP,US);
C08L31/04 (EP,US);
C08L67/025 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C09J131/04, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C09J133/08, C08L2666/20 (US,EP);
C09J139/06, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C09J167/00, C08L2666/02 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/08] | Title | German: | Verbesserte thermoplastische hydrophile Klebstoffzusammensetzungen für trockene und nasse Oberflächen, wobei die Zusammensetzungen eine erhöhte Wasseradhäsionsstabilität aufweisen | [2004/08] | English: | Improved thermoplastic hydrophilic adhesive compositions for dry and wet surfaces the compositions having an increased water adhesion stability | [2004/08] | French: | Compositions thermoplastiques hydrophiles adhesives améliorées pour des surfaces seches et humides ayant une stabilité d'adhesion augmentée en présence d'eau | [2004/08] | Examination procedure | 20.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 26.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 07.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/19] | 21.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/19] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.01.2006 | Request for further processing for: | 07.12.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 07.12.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.12.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0527447 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [X] 3,4,8-12,15-18 * example 1 *; | [X]US6103809 (AHMED SHARF U [US], et al) [X] 3,4,8-12,15-18 * examples 1-8 * * column 6, line 24 - line 30 * * column 7, line 6 - line 20 * * column 8, line 8 - line 13 * * column 10, line 6 *; | [X]EP1043377 (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST [US]) [X] 3,4,8-12,15-18 * page 2, line 26 * * page 3, line 10 - line 11 * * page 4, line 47 * * page 5, line 16 ** page 6, line 6 * |