EP1391606 - Metering device with adjustable flow rate and method for setting a flow rate of a metering device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.2006 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens VDO Automotive S.p.A. S.S. 206 - km 28 - Loc. Luciana 56040 Fauglia (Pisa) / IT | [2005/51] |
Former [2004/09] | For all designated states Siemens VDO Automotive S.p.A. S.S. 206 - km 28 - Loc. Luciana 56040 Fauglia (Pisa) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gromek Bogdan 16 Graham Drive 23606 Newport News, VA / US | 02 /
Matteucci Luca Via G. Luzzatto, 18 56124 Pisa / IT | 03 /
Shen Jim Via Degli Oleandri, 67 56018 Tirrenia (Pisa) / IT | [2004/09] | Representative(s) | Berg, Peter, et al European Patent Attorney Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/09] | Berg, Peter, Dipl.-Ing., et al European Patent Attorney, Siemens AG, Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02018661.5 | 20.08.2002 | [2004/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1391606 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1391606 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F02M51/06, F02M61/20, F02M61/16 | [2004/09] | CPC: |
F02M61/205 (EP);
F02M51/0603 (EP);
F02M61/167 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2004/47] |
Former [2004/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Dosiergerät mit einstellbarem Durchfluss und Verfahren zur Einstellung des Durchflusses eines Dosiergeräts | [2004/09] | English: | Metering device with adjustable flow rate and method for setting a flow rate of a metering device | [2004/09] | French: | Doseur à débit réglable et procédé pour établir le débit d'un doseur | [2004/09] | Examination procedure | 04.08.2003 | Examination requested [2004/09] | 16.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.12.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | 01.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 01.10.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 01.10.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/38] | IT | 21.12.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0347460 ; | [A]JPH10159673 ; | [AY]GB2094940 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1,2,4,6 * page 1, column 121 - page 3, column 105; figure - * [Y] 3,5; | [DY]EP1046809 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DY] 5 * column 9, line 30 - line 54; figures 1,4 *; | [Y]WO0129400 (WESTPORT RES INC [CA], et al) [Y] 3 * abstract *; | [A]EP1167747 (DENSO CORP [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910516), vol. 015, no. 190, Database accession no. (M - 1113), & JP03047460 A 19910228 (TOYOTA AUTOM LOOM WORKS LTD) [A] * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 1998, no. 11, & JP10159673 A 19980616 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [A] * abstract * | by applicant | EP1046809 |