EP1287734 - Large plant containers for building walls [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kessler, Martin Kohlenstrasse 7 58452 Witten / DE | [2003/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/10] | Representative(s) | Wanischeck-Bergmann, Axel Stenger - Watzke - Ring intellectual property Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [2008/43] |
Former [2003/10] | Wanischeck-Bergmann, Axel Köhne & Wanischeck-Bergmann & Schwarz, Rondorfer Strasse 5a 50968 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 02018674.8 | 21.08.2002 | [2003/10] | Priority number, date | DE2001141562 | 24.08.2001 Original published format: DE 10141562 | [2003/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1287734 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1287734 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | [2004/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A01G9/02 | [2003/10] | CPC: |
A01G9/025 (EP);
Y02P60/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/42] |
Former [2003/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Gross-Pflanzgefäss für Gabäudefassaden | [2003/10] | English: | Large plant containers for building walls | [2003/10] | French: | Grands conteneurs à plantes pour façades de bâtiments | [2003/10] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/16] | 17.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 01.09.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 01.09.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE3439838 (WEGERHOFF DIETER) [X] 1,5,9 * page 15, line 1 - line 16; figure 1 *[A] 2; | [YA]DE4105043 (WEBER JOACHIM [DE]) [Y] 2,10 * the whole document * [A] 1; | [XA]CH686065 (FERRACINA MARIO FERRUCCIO [CH]) [X] 1,5,9,10 * the whole document * [A] 2-4; | [XY]US5664367 (HUANG HSIU-LIN [TW]) [X] 1,5,9 * column 2, line 45 - line 65; figures 5-7 * [Y] 2,10; | [XA]FR2774576 (BOUILLARD FRERES [FR]) [X] 1,5,9 * page 4, line 7 - page 5, line 11; figures 1,2 * [A] 2-4,6,7,10 |