EP1298238 - Mounting of a selecting element on the body of a system part [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Groz-Beckert KG Parkweg 2 72458 Albstadt / DE | [2003/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fehrenbacher, Eckhard Lichtensteinstrasse 3 71149 Bondorf / DE | [2003/14] | Representative(s) | Rüger Abel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 04 61 73704 Esslingen a.N. / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/14] | Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Patentanwälte Postfach 10 04 61 73704 Esslingen a.N. / DE | Application number, filing date | 02018938.7 | 26.08.2002 | [2003/14] | Priority number, date | DE20011048196 | 28.09.2001 Original published format: DE 10148196 | [2003/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1298238 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1298238 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | D04B15/68, D04B35/02 | [2003/14] | CPC: |
D04B35/02 (EP,KR,US);
D04B15/68 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, TR [2004/01] |
Former [2003/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Montage eines Auswahltelements an dem Körper eines Systemteils | [2003/14] | English: | Mounting of a selecting element on the body of a system part | [2003/14] | French: | Montage d'un élément de sélection sur le corps d'une pièce d'un système | [2003/14] | Examination procedure | 18.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/46] | 03.10.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.01.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK | 22.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.11.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2003 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2003 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2003 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.11.2003 | SK   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/38] | IT | 07.12.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE7513746U (FABRIQUE NATIONALE HERSTAL S.A.) [X] 1-3 * page 4, line 12 - page 5, line 2; figure 1 *; | [A]JPH1077557 ; | [A]GB1525629 (DUBIED & CIE SA E) [A] 7,9-12 * figure 1; claim 3 *; | [A]US5666826 (MISTA KRESIMIR [DE]) [A] 7,13,14* column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 23 *; | [X]EP0814187 (PRECISION FUKUHARA WORKS LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3 * column 3, lines 14-37; figures 2,4 * * column 3, line 43 - column 4, line 17 *; | [A]US6145349 (SCIACCA FRANCO [IT]) [A] 1,4,5 * column 2, lines 41-55; figures 1,7-11 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980630), vol. 1998, no. 08, & JP10077557 A 19980324 (IKENAGA:KK) [A] 4,5 * abstract * | Examination | DE3915684 | EP0908548 | EP1241287 |