blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1275393

EP1275393 - Pharmaceutical formulation containing pteridine derivative [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.03.2006
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip17.03.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.05.2006  [2006/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
University of Strathclyde
McCance Building, 16 Richmond Street Glasgow G1 1YQ
Scotland / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/03]For all designated states
University of Strathclyde
McCance Building, 16 Richmond Street
Glasgow G1 1YQ, Scotland / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Wood, Hamish Christopher Swan
26 Albert Drive
Bearsden, Glasgow G61 2PG / GB
02 / Rees, Lilias
100 Pollock Drive
Bishopbriggs, Glasgow G64 2DZ / GB
03 / Suckling, Colin James
62 North Grange Road
Bearsden, Glasgow G61 3AF / GB
 [2003/03]
Representative(s)Horner, Martin Grenville, et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
Aurora
120 Bothwell Street
Glasgow
G2 7JS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/03]Horner, Martin Grenville, et al
Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square
Glasgow G1 3AE Scotland / GB
Application number, filing date02018955.103.09.1987
[2003/03]
Priority number, dateGB1986002126803.09.1986         Original published format: GB 8621268
[2003/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1275393
Date:15.01.2003
Language:EN
[2003/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1275393
Date:11.05.2005
Language:EN
[2005/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.11.2002
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/525, C07D475/04
[2003/03]
CPC:
C07D475/04 (EP,US); A61P35/00 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [2003/03]
TitleGerman:Pteridinderivat enthaltende pharmazeutische Zusammensetzung[2003/03]
English:Pharmaceutical formulation containing pteridine derivative[2003/03]
French:Composition pharmaceutique contenant un dérivé de ptéridine[2003/03]
Examination procedure24.09.2002Examination requested  [2003/03]
09.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
11.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.11.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.03.2005Fee for grant paid
10.03.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP87307803.4  / EP0266042
Opposition(s)14.02.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
24.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
24.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
24.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
24.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 08
24.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 09
24.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 10
24.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 11
24.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 12
24.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 13
24.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 14
24.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 15
24.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 16
12.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 17
14.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 18
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]GB1560372  (WELLCOME FOUND) [X] 1,3,7,8* page 1, lines 1-50 *
Examination   - AACR ABSTRACTS, (1984), no. 1234
    - THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1978), vol. 253, no. 1, pages 242 - 245
    - TETRAHEDRON, (1986), vol. 42, no. 1, pages 117 - 136
    - JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1952), vol. 74, no. 16, pages 4215 - 4216
    - CANCER TREATMENT REPORTS, (1981), vol. 65, no. 11-12, pages 1117 - 1119
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.