EP1288680 - Scintillator panel for a radiation detection device and system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2011/29] |
Former [2003/10] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2 Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okada, Satoshi, Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Ogawa, Yoshihiro, Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Takenaka, Katsuro, Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2003/10] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/10] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02018957.7 | 26.08.2002 | [2003/10] | Priority number, date | JP20010256518 | 27.08.2001 Original published format: JP 2001256518 | [2003/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1288680 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1288680 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | [2004/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1288680 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01T1/202, G01T1/24, G01T1/20 | [2004/06] | CPC: |
G01T1/202 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/10] | G01T1/202, G01T1/24 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2004/44] |
Former [2003/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Szintillationspanel für Strahlungsabfrageeinheit und -system | [2003/10] | English: | Scintillator panel for a radiation detection device and system | [2003/10] | French: | Panneau de scintillation pour un dispositif et un système de détection de rayonnement | [2003/10] | Examination procedure | 15.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/34] | 01.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 20.07.2011 | NL | 20.07.2011 | FR | 20.09.2011 | [2012/37] |
Former [2012/23] | IT | 20.07.2011 | |
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | NL | 20.07.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4985633 (VIEUX GERARD [FR], et al) [A] 1,5-7 * abstract * * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 16 * * figure - *; | [A]EP0903590 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK [JP]) [A] 1,3,5-7 * abstract * * column 7, line 9 - line 25 * * column 8, line 54 - column 9, line 30 * * figure - *; | [A] - TORNAI M P ET AL, "Investigation of micro-columnar scintillators on an optical fiber coupled compact imaging system", NUCLEAR SCIENCE SYMPOSIUM CONFERENCE RECORD, 2000 IEEE LYON, FRANCE 15-20 OCT. 2000, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (20001025), ISBN 0-7803-6503-8, pages 2119 - 2123, XP010556727 [A] 1,5,6 * the entire document * |