EP1289349 - Discharge lamp device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/01] | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 488-8661 / JP | ||
Former [2003/10] | For all designated states Denso Corporation 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Toyama, Koichi, Denso Corporation Int. Prop. Dept., 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | 02 /
Yamaguchi, Hironao, Denso Corporation Int. Prop. Dept., 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | [2003/10] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/10] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patentanwaltsgesellschaft dbR Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 02019021.1 | 26.08.2002 | [2003/10] | Priority number, date | JP20010256772 | 27.08.2001 Original published format: JP 2001256772 | [2003/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1289349 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1289349 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | [2003/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1289349 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/292, H05B41/02, H05K9/00 | [2003/50] | CPC: |
H05B41/292 (EP,US);
F21S41/172 (EP,US);
Y10S315/07 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/10] | H05B41/292 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2004/36] |
Former [2003/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Entladungslampenanordnung | [2003/10] | English: | Discharge lamp device | [2003/10] | French: | Dispositif de lampe à décharge | [2003/10] | Examination procedure | 26.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/05] | 22.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/38] | IT | 04.01.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5030889 (EL-HAMAMSY SAYED-AMR A [US], et al); | [A]US5107185 (EL-HAMAMSY SAYED-AMR A [US], et al) [A] 1-4,9,11 * column 3, line 22 - column 6, line 61; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5124895 (SEGOSHI TORU [JP], et al); | [A]DE19710691 (KOITO MFG CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0855851 (TOYO DENSO KK [JP]) [A] 1-4,9,11 * column 1, line 38 - column 4, line 7; figures 1-12 *; | [A]EP1003356 (DENSO CORP [JP]); | [A]FR2795595 (BESACIER JEAN ADRIEN [FR]); | [E]US2002117970 (AIDA KENJI [JP]) [E] 1-4 * abstract * |