EP1288510 - Four-point contact ball bearing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.2012 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | ||
Former [2003/10] | For all designated states KOYO SEIKO CO., LTD. 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka 542-0081 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iwata, Takashi c/o Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd 5-8, Minamisemba 3 ch., Chuo-Ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-0081 / JP | 02 /
Nakagawa, Yoshitaka c/o Koyo Seiko Co., Ltd 5-8, Minamisemba 3-ch., Chuo-Ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-0081 / JP | [2003/10] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/10] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02019085.6 | 28.08.2002 | [2003/10] | Priority number, date | JP20010257895 | 28.08.2001 Original published format: JP 2001257895 | JP20010265865 | 03.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001265865 | JP20010267060 | 04.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001267060 | [2003/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1288510 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1288510 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | [2006/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16C19/16, F16C33/62 | [2006/44] | CPC: |
F16C19/166 (EP,US);
F16C33/58 (KR);
F16C33/585 (EP,US);
F16C2240/34 (EP,US);
F16C2240/40 (EP);
F16C2240/76 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/10] | F16C19/16, F16C33/64 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2007/28] |
Former [2003/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vier-Punkte- Axial/-Radialwälzlager | [2003/10] | English: | Four-point contact ball bearing | [2003/10] | French: | Palier à roulement axial radial à quatre points de contact | [2003/10] | Examination procedure | 29.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/07] | 03.05.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.08.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | 30.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/35] | 10.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.10.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.06.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.06.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.06.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 12.06.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.06.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.06.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 12.06.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.06.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.06.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 12.06.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.06.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.06.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.06.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.06.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.06.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.06.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.06.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.06.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.06.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.06.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2011 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3529975 (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER KG [DE]) [A] 1,6,7* abstract *; | [A]US6082906 (SATOU TAKANOBU [JP], et al) [A] 1,6,7 * column 3, line 3 - column 7, line 45; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US6116786 (TAKATA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,6,7 * column 2, line 46 - column 5, line 21; figures 1-8 *; | [A]DE19962191 (NSK LTD [JP]) [A] 1,6,7 * abstract *; | [A]US6244408 (TOBAYAMA MASASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,6,7 * column 3, line 23 - column 5, line 10; figures 1-3 * |