EP1260652 - Floor panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.05.2005 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2005 | Refusal of application | published on 13.07.2005 [2005/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kronotex GmbH & Co. KG Wittstocker Chaussee 1 16909 Heiligengrabe / DE | [2002/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [2002/48] | Representative(s) | Rehmann, Thorsten, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Frankfurter Straße 3c 38122 Braunschweig / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/48] | Rehmann, Thorsten, Dipl.-Ing., et al GRAMM, LINS & PARTNER GbR, Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 1 38122 Braunschweig / DE | Application number, filing date | 02019272.0 | 18.09.1999 | [2002/48] | Priority number, date | DE19981051200 | 06.11.1998 Original published format: DE 19851200 | [2002/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1260652 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1260652 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | [2003/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E04F15/04, F16B5/00 | [2002/48] | CPC: |
F16B5/008 (EP,US);
B29C48/07 (EP,US);
E04F15/04 (EP,US);
B29C48/0011 (EP,US);
E04F2201/0115 (EP,US);
E04F2201/0153 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/48] | Title | German: | Fussbodenpaneel | [2002/48] | English: | Floor panel | [2002/48] | French: | Panneau de plancher | [2002/48] | Examination procedure | 09.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/12] | 26.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2005/28] | 25.02.2005 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2005/28] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99118525.7 / EP0999321 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1581384 (PEDERSEN) [A] 1,3,5-9,11,13-15 * page 1, line 42 - page 2, line 27; figure 1 *; | [Y]WO9747834 (UNILIN BEHEER BV [NL]) [Y] 1,2,4-8,14 * page 9, line 25 - page 28, line 3; figures 1-11,22-25 *; | [Y]DE29803708U (SHEN TECHNICAL COMPANY LTD [CY]) [Y] 1,2,4-8,14 * page 4, line 1 - page 6, line 13; figures 1,2 *; | [D]US6006486 (MORIAU STEFAN SIMON GUSTAAF [BE], et al) |