EP1296434 - Communication device power supplying structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/48] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2003/13] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsunoda, Masahiro c/o NEC Communications System, Ltd.. 4-28, Mita 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Ooi, Mitsuyoshi c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2007/29] |
Former [2003/13] | 01 /
Tsunoda, Masahiro NEC Communications System,Ltd., 4-28, Mita 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Ooi, Mitsuyoshi c/o NEC Corporatio, 7-1, shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Baronetzky, Klaus Splanemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Rumfordstrasse 7 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/13] | Baronetzky, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. Splanemann Reitzner Baronetzky Westendorp Patentanwälte Rumfordstrasse 7 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02019467.6 | 30.08.2002 | [2003/13] | Priority number, date | JP20010266357 | 03.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001266357 | [2003/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1296434 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1296434 | Date: | 06.04.2005 | [2005/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1296434 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/18 | [2005/14] | CPC: |
H04M19/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/13] | H02J1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/52] |
Former [2003/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Stromversorgungstruktur für Kommunikationsgerät | [2003/13] | English: | Communication device power supplying structure | [2003/13] | French: | Structure d'alimentation de puissance pour un dispositif de communication | [2003/13] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/17] | 10.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05315775 ; | [A]GB1057249 (AUTOMATIC TELEPHONE & ELECT) [A] 1-20 * page 2, line 69 - line 86; figure 1 *; | [A]US5867372 (SHIE WU-MING [TW]) [A] 1-20 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 20; figures 1-3 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940225), vol. 018, no. 120, Database accession no. (E - 1516), & JP05315775 A 19931126 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-20 * abstract * |