EP1293605 - Level crossing between two roads [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.08.2006 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.09.2006 [2006/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Peter Maier Leichtbau GmbH Gottlieb-Daimler-Strasse 7 78224 Singen / DE | [2003/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maier, Peter Postweg 19 78256 Steisslingen / DE | [2003/12] | Representative(s) | Weiss, Peter Dr. Weiss & Arat Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Zeppelinstrasse 4 78234 Engen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/12] | Weiss, Peter, Dr. Zeppelinstrasse 4 78234 Engen / DE | Application number, filing date | 02019560.8 | 02.09.2002 | [2003/12] | Priority number, date | DE2001145235 | 13.09.2001 Original published format: DE 10145235 | [2003/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1293605 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1293605 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | [2004/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E01C9/04 | [2003/12] | CPC: |
E01C9/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/12] | Title | German: | Übergang zwischen zwei Fahrbahnen | [2003/12] | English: | Level crossing between two roads | [2003/12] | French: | Passage à niveau entre deux routes | [2003/12] | Examination procedure | 02.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 01.04.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/38] | 08.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3172508 (JOHN DOERING, et al) [Y] 1-5,8* the whole document *; | [YA]DE19704366 (FRANK HARALD [DE]) [Y] 1-5,8 * the whole document * [A] 6 |