EP1293779 - Biosensor surface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.10.2010 [2010/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2003/12] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-ashigara-shi Kanagawa-ken, 250-0193 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yang, Bo, c/o Hitec Co., Ltd., Yokohama R&D Center Queen's Tower Bldg. A Block 12F, Minatomirai 2-3-1 Nishi-ku, Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 220-6012 / JP | 02 /
Kageyama, Shigeki Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 11-46 Senzui 3-chome Asaka-shi, Saitama 351-8585 / JP | 03 /
Kojima, Masayoshi Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 11-46 Senzui 3-chome Asaka-shi, Saitama 351-8585 / JP | 04 /
Ito, Toshihisa Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 11-46 Senzui 3-chome Asaka-shi, Saitama 351-8585 / JP | 05 /
Shinoki, Hiroshi Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 11-46 Senzui 3-chome Asaka-shi, Saitama 351-8585 / JP | 06 /
Abe, Yoshihiko Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 11-46 Senzui 3-chome Asaka-shi, Saitama 351-8585 / JP | [2003/12] | Representative(s) | Albrecht, Thomas, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Albrecht, Thomas, et al Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/12] | Albrecht, Thomas, Dr., et al Kraus & Weisert, Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02019719.0 | 03.09.2002 | [2003/12] | Priority number, date | JP20010265484 | 03.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001265484 | [2003/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1293779 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1293779 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | [2003/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543, B05D1/18 | [2003/12] | CPC: |
G01N33/54393 (EP,US);
G01N33/54373 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/12] | Title | German: | Biosensoroberfläche | [2003/12] | English: | Biosensor surface | [2003/12] | French: | Surface de biocapteur | [2003/12] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/32] | 04.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/40] | 20.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5242828 (BERGSTROEM JAN [SE], et al) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [DX]US5942397 (TARLOV MICHAEL J [US], et al) [DX] 1,2,4,6,8-11 * column 1, line 45 - column 4, line 21 *; | [X]US6197515 (BAMDAD CYNTHIA C [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,8-13,15,19 * column 6, lines 10-21 * * column 9, line 46 - column 12, line 60; examples 1,2 *; | [E]WO02078947 (PROLINX INC [US], et al) [E] 1-4,6,9-13,15,19 * page 8, line 24 - page 12, line 28 * * page 14, line 30 - page 19, line 15; example 10 *; | [X] - L. S. JUNG ET AL, "Surface plasmon resonance measurement of binding and dissociation of wild-type and mutant streptavidin on mixed biotin-containing alkylthiolate monolayers", SENSORS & ACTUATORS B, (1999), vol. 54, pages 137 - 144, XP004163223 [X] 1-4,6,9-13,15,19 * pages 141-143; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0925-4005(98)00332-3 | [X] - B. T. HOUSEMAN & M. MRKSICH, "The role of ligand density in the enzymatic glycosylation of carbohydrates preented on self-assembled monolayers of alkanethiolates on gold", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE INTERNATIONAL EDITION ENGLISH, (1999), vol. 38, no. 6, pages 782 - 785, XP002229682 [X] 1-4,6,9-12 * figures 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1521-3773(19990315)38:6<782::AID-ANIE782>3.3.CO;2-E | [X] - D. D. SCHLERETH & R. P. H. KOOYMAN, "Self-assembled monolayers with biospecific affinity for NAD(H)-dependent dehydrogenases: characterization by surface plasmon resonance combined with electrochemistry "in situ"", JOURNAL OF ELECTROANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (1998), vol. 444, pages 231 - 240, XP002229683 [X] 1-4,7-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-0728(97)00578-0 | [X] - J. LAHIRI ET AL, "A strategy for the generation of surfaces presenting ligands for studies of binding based on an active ester as a common reactive intermediate: a surface plasmon resonance study", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (1999), vol. 71, pages 777 - 790, XP002229684 [X] 1-6,9-16,19,20 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac980959t | [X] - N. PATEL ET AL, "Immobilization of protein molecules onto homogeneous and mixed carboxylate-terminated self-assembled monolayers", LANGMUIR, (1997), vol. 13, pages 6485 - 6490, XP002229685 [X] 1-7,9-22 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/la970933h | [A] - OSTUNI E ET AL, "THE INTERACTION OF PROTEINS AND CELLS WITH SELF-ASSEMBLED MONOLAYERS OF ALKANETHIOLATES ON GOLD AND SILVER", COLLOIDS AND SURFACES. B, BIOINTERFACES, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM,, NL, (1999), vol. 15, ISSN 0927-7765, pages 3 - 30, XP002941782 [A] 1-24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0927-7765(99)00004-1 | [A] - MIRSKY V M ET AL, "CAPACITIVE MONITORING OF PROTEIN IMMOBILIZATION AND ANTIGEN- ANTIBODY REACTIONS ON MONOMOLECULAR ALKYLTHIOL FILMS ON GOLD ELECTRODES", BIOSENSORS & BIOELECTRONICS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, BARKING, GB, (1997), vol. 12, no. 9/10, ISSN 0956-5663, pages 977 - 989, XP000863452 [A] 1-24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0956-5663(97)00053-5 |