EP1290987 - Self articulating stent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEDINOL LTD. P.O. Box 58165, Kiryat Atidim, Bldg. 3, 4th Fl. Tel Aviv 61581 / IL | [2006/03] |
Former [2003/11] | For all designated states Medinol Ltd. P.O. Box 58165, Kiryat Atidim, Bldg. 3, 4th Fl. Tel Aviv 61581 / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pinchasik, Gregory 6/143 Tsamarot Street 46424 Herzelia / IS | [2003/11] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/12] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Postfach 19 64 85319 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2003/11] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost - Altenburg - Geissler - Isenbruck, Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02019755.4 | 04.09.2002 | [2003/11] | Priority number, date | US20010317185P | 06.09.2001 Original published format: US 317185 P | [2003/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1290987 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1290987 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | [2004/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1290987 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/06 | [2003/11] | CPC: |
A61F2/91 (EP,US);
A61F2/86 (KR);
A61F2/04 (KR);
A61F2/915 (EP,US);
A61F2002/828 (EP,US);
A61F2002/91508 (EP,US);
A61F2002/91525 (EP,US);
A61F2002/91533 (EP,US);
A61F2002/91541 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/11] | Extension states | AL | 01.06.2004 | LT | 01.06.2004 | LV | 01.06.2004 | MK | 01.06.2004 | RO | 01.06.2004 | SI | 01.06.2004 | Title | German: | Gelenkiger Stent | [2003/11] | English: | Self articulating stent | [2003/11] | French: | Stent articulé | [2003/11] | Examination procedure | 01.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/31] | 07.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.01.2006 | CH | 18.01.2006 | CY | 18.01.2006 | CZ | 18.01.2006 | EE | 18.01.2006 | FI | 18.01.2006 | LI | 18.01.2006 | SK | 18.01.2006 | TR | 18.01.2006 | BG | 18.04.2006 | DK | 18.04.2006 | SE | 18.04.2006 | GR | 19.04.2006 | ES | 29.04.2006 | PT | 19.06.2006 | LU | 04.09.2006 | MC | 30.09.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
CH | 18.01.2006 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2006 | ||
EE | 18.01.2006 | ||
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
LI | 18.01.2006 | ||
SK | 18.01.2006 | ||
TR | 18.01.2006 | ||
BG | 18.04.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
GR | 19.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
LU | 04.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
CH | 18.01.2006 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2006 | ||
EE | 18.01.2006 | ||
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
LI | 18.01.2006 | ||
SK | 18.01.2006 | ||
BG | 18.04.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
GR | 19.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
CH | 18.01.2006 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2006 | ||
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
LI | 18.01.2006 | ||
SK | 18.01.2006 | ||
BG | 18.04.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
GR | 19.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
CH | 18.01.2006 | ||
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
LI | 18.01.2006 | ||
SK | 18.01.2006 | ||
BG | 18.04.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
GR | 19.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
CH | 18.01.2006 | ||
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
LI | 18.01.2006 | ||
SK | 18.01.2006 | ||
BG | 18.04.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
CH | 18.01.2006 | ||
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
IT | 18.01.2006 | ||
LI | 18.01.2006 | ||
SK | 18.01.2006 | ||
BG | 18.04.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
CH | 18.01.2006 | ||
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
LI | 18.01.2006 | ||
SK | 18.01.2006 | ||
BG | 18.04.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
CH | 18.01.2006 | ||
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
LI | 18.01.2006 | ||
BG | 18.04.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
CH | 18.01.2006 | ||
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
LI | 18.01.2006 | ||
BG | 18.04.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
CH | 18.01.2006 | ||
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
LI | 18.01.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
CH | 18.01.2006 | ||
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
LI | 18.01.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | CH | 18.01.2006 | |
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
LI | 18.01.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | ES | 29.04.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5593442 (KLEIN ENRIQUE J [US]) [X] 1,16 * figure 2 *; | [XY]EP0806190 (SORIN BIOMEDICA CARDIO SPA [IT]) [X] 1,2,7,9-24 * figure 2 * * column 4, line 49 - line 59 * [Y] 3-6,8; | [A]WO9917680 (LOCALMED INC [US]) [A] 14,23 * page 16, line 24 - line 30 *; | [A]WO0030563 (SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 3,4 * figure 3 * * page 8, line 11 - line 20 * * page 17, line 28 - line 30 *; | [A]EP1110515 (MEDINOL LTD [IL]) [A] 1-24* the whole document *; | [A]US6270524 (KIM STEVEN W [US]) [A] 1-24 * column 10, line 7 - line 9 * * figure 1 * * column 13, line 41 - line 48 *; | [Y]EP1129673 (MEDINOL LTD [IL]) [Y] 3-6,8 * figure 3 * |