EP1293574 - Reagents, methods and devices for detecting analytes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.2008 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER CORPORATION 100 Bayer Road Pittsburgh, PA 15205 / US | [2007/47] |
Former [2003/12] | For all designated states Bayer Corporation 100 Bayer Road Pittsburgh, PA 15205 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vreeke, Mark S. 2345 Bering 633 Houston, TX 77057 / US | 02 /
Warchal-Windham, Mary Ellen 10272 Jefferson Road Osceola, IN 46561 / US | 03 /
Blaschke, Christina 69590 Bellows Road White Pigeon, MI 49099 / US | 04 /
Mikel, Barbara J. 1503 Kensington Place Mishawaka, IN 46544 / US | 05 /
Cooper, Howard A. 3527 Wood Street Elkhart, IN 46516 / US | [2003/12] | Representative(s) | Köhler, Ferdinand, et al Bayer AG BayerHealthcare Legal & Patents Patents and Licensing 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/12] | Köhler, Ferdinand, Dr., et al Bayer AG, BayerHealthcare, Legal & Patents, Patents and Licensing 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 02019843.8 | 09.09.2002 | [2003/12] | Priority number, date | US20010318716P | 14.09.2001 Original published format: US 318716 P | [2003/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1293574 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1293574 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | [2004/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1293574 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/00, C12Q1/32, C12Q1/54 | [2003/12] | CPC: |
C12Q1/54 (EP,US);
C12Q1/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/12] | Title | German: | Reagenzien, Verfahren und Vorrichtungen zum Nachweis von Analyten | [2003/12] | English: | Reagents, methods and devices for detecting analytes | [2003/12] | French: | Réactifs, méthodes et dispositifs pour la détection des analytes | [2003/12] | Examination procedure | 03.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/45] | 08.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07018162.3 / EP1867732 | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.11.2007 | BE | 21.11.2007 | CY | 21.11.2007 | CZ | 21.11.2007 | EE | 21.11.2007 | NL | 21.11.2007 | SK | 21.11.2007 | TR | 21.11.2007 | BG | 21.02.2008 | GR | 22.02.2008 | PT | 21.04.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2009/33] | AT | 21.11.2007 | |
BE | 21.11.2007 | ||
CY | 21.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2007 | ||
EE | 21.11.2007 | ||
NL | 21.11.2007 | ||
SK | 21.11.2007 | ||
BG | 21.02.2008 | ||
GR | 22.02.2008 | ||
PT | 21.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 21.11.2007 | |
BE | 21.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2007 | ||
EE | 21.11.2007 | ||
NL | 21.11.2007 | ||
SK | 21.11.2007 | ||
BG | 21.02.2008 | ||
GR | 22.02.2008 | ||
PT | 21.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 21.11.2007 | |
BE | 21.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2007 | ||
NL | 21.11.2007 | ||
SK | 21.11.2007 | ||
BG | 21.02.2008 | ||
GR | 22.02.2008 | ||
PT | 21.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 21.11.2007 | |
BE | 21.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2007 | ||
NL | 21.11.2007 | ||
SK | 21.11.2007 | ||
BG | 21.02.2008 | ||
PT | 21.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 21.11.2007 | |
BE | 21.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2007 | ||
NL | 21.11.2007 | ||
SK | 21.11.2007 | ||
BG | 21.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | AT | 21.11.2007 | |
CZ | 21.11.2007 | ||
NL | 21.11.2007 | ||
BG | 21.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 21.11.2007 | |
NL | 21.11.2007 | ||
BG | 21.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | NL | 21.11.2007 | |
BG | 21.02.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4711245 (HIGGINS IRVING J [GB], et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 4, line 1 - line 28; claims 14-16,19 *; | [A]EP0330517 (ENZYMATICS INC [US]) [A] 1-10* page 12, line 46 - line 58; examples 2,3; claim 1 *; | [AX]WO9207263 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [A] 2-10 * page 4, paragraph 2 - page 5, paragraph 3 * * page 11, line 10 - line 14 * [X] 1; | [Y]WO9207953 (VALTION TEKNILLINEN [FI]) [Y] 1-10 * page 6, paragraph 2 - page 7, paragraph 2; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [YD]US5520786 (BLOCZYNSKI MICHAEL L [US], et al) [YD] 1-10 * column 3, line 11 - line 36; examples 1,4; claim -; table 1 *; | [A]EP1130111 (LIFESCAN INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 4, line 33 - line 37; figure 4; claim - * |