EP1291080 - Process for production of partially hydrophilized porous adsorbents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOSOH CORPORATION 4560, Kaisei-cho Shinnanyo-shi Yamaguchi-ken, 746-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | For all designated states Tosoh Corporation 4560, Kaisei-cho Shinnanyo-shi, Yamaguchi-ken, 746-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakamura, Koji 3079-3, Ooaza Tonda Shinnanyo-shi, Yamaguchi / JP | 02 /
Komiya, Katsuo 7-17-19, Nijigaoka Hikari-shi, Yamaguchi / JP | 03 /
Fujii, Satoshi 2-12-17, Doi Shinnanyo-shi, Yamaguchi / JP | [2003/11] | Representative(s) | Holmes, Miles Keeton, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | Holmes, Miles, et al Novagraaf International S.A. 25, avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets, Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 02019844.6 | 09.09.2002 | [2003/11] | Priority number, date | JP20010272947 | 10.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001272947 | JP20010272948 | 10.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001272948 | JP20010306209 | 02.10.2001 Original published format: JP 2001306209 | [2003/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1291080 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1291080 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | [2004/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B01J20/32, B01J20/26 | [2004/21] | CPC: |
B01J20/261 (EP,US);
B01J20/26 (EP,US);
B01J20/265 (EP,US);
B01J20/267 (EP,US);
B01J20/321 (EP,US);
B01J20/3248 (EP,US);
B01J20/3285 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/11] | B01J20/32 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2005/06] |
Former [2003/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von teilweise hydrophilisierten Adsorptionsmitteln | [2003/11] | English: | Process for production of partially hydrophilized porous adsorbents | [2003/11] | French: | Procédé pour la production d'adsorbants partiellement hydrophilisés | [2003/11] | Examination procedure | 11.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/42] | 13.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/39] | 11.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH06296860 ; | [X]JPH0236199 ; | [X]WO8907618 (CUNO INC [US]) [X] 1,4,7 * page 9, line 26 - page 77, line 9; example -; claim -; table - *; | [X]EP0878481 (MOELNLYCKE AB [SE]) [X] 1,4,7* page 6, line 43 - page 7, line 56; example -; claim -; table - * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950228), vol. 1995, no. 01, & JP06296860 A 19941025 (ASAHI MEDICAL CO LTD) [X] 1,4,7 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900419), vol. 014, no. 192, Database accession no. (C - 0711), & JP02036199 A 19900206 (ASAHI MEDICAL CO LTD) [X] 1,4,7 * abstract * |