EP1300574 - Method and Apparatus for Controlling an Internal Combustion Engine during Changeover between two Combustion Modes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2008/04] |
Former [2003/15] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hartmann, Dirk Hohewartstrasse 44 70469 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
Eberle, Kristina Pforzheimer Strasse 11 71706 Hardthof / DE | [2003/15] | Application number, filing date | 02020128.1 | 07.09.2002 | [2003/15] | Priority number, date | DE2001148871 | 04.10.2001 Original published format: DE 10148871 | [2003/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1300574 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1300574 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | [2005/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1300574 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/30, F02D33/02, F02D37/02 | [2005/02] | CPC: |
F02D37/02 (EP);
F02D41/0002 (EP);
F02D41/307 (EP);
F02P5/1504 (EP);
F02D11/10 (EP);
F02D2011/102 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2003/15] | F02D41/30 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [2005/39] |
Former [2003/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Steuerung einer Brennkraftmaschine beim Wechsel zwischen zwei Betriebsarten | [2003/15] | English: | Method and Apparatus for Controlling an Internal Combustion Engine during Changeover between two Combustion Modes | [2003/15] | French: | Procédé et Dispositiv de Commande d'un Moteur à Combustion Interne pendant l'échangement entre deux Modes de Combustion | [2003/15] | Examination procedure | 15.02.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/36] | 05.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0893596 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1,8-14 * column 15, line 55 - column 17, line 11; figures 6,9 * [A] 2-5; | [XA]DE19824915 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [X] 1,8-14 * column 4, line 61 - line 65 * * column 9, line 26 - line 55; figure 3 * [A] 2-5; | [XA]EP0922847 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1,8-14 * paragraph [0024]; figure 9 * [A] 6,7; | [A]US6279561 (COOPER STEPHEN LEE ET AL) [A] 1,6-14 * column 5, line 42 - column 6, line 4; figure 2 *; | [A]DE19746902 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,8,9,11,13 * the whole document * |