EP1292006 - Half bridge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Karrer, Volker Keilberger Hauptstrasse 81b 93055 Regensburg / DE | [2003/11] | Application number, filing date | 02020186.9 | 09.09.2002 | [2003/11] | Priority number, date | DE2001144671 | 11.09.2001 Original published format: DE 10144671 | [2003/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1292006 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/11] | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/00 | [2003/11] | CPC: |
H02M7/003 (EP,US);
H01L24/49 (EP,US);
H01L2224/0603 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48227 (EP,US);
H01L2224/49111 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/13055 (EP,US);
H01L2924/13091 (EP,US);
H01L2924/14 (EP,US);
H01L2924/181 (EP,US);
H01L2924/19107 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45015, H01L2924/207 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45099 (EP,US);
H01L2924/13055, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/13091, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/14, H01L2924/00 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Halbbrücke | [2003/11] | English: | Half bridge | [2003/11] | French: | Demi-pont | [2003/11] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/45] | 30.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |