EP1306186 - Adjustable rotating unit for horizontal injection molding machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2007 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krauss-Maffei Kunststofftechnik GmbH Krauss-Maffei Strasse 2 80997 München / DE | [2003/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lichtinger, Peter Albrecht-Dürer-Strasse 4 82256 Fürstenfeldbruck / DE | [2003/18] | Representative(s) | Wilhelm, Ludwig, et al KraussMaffei Group GmbH Krauss-Maffei-Strasse 2 80997 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Wilhelm, Ludwig, et al KraussMaffei AG Krauss-Maffei-Strasse 2 80997 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/37] | Wilhelm, Ludwig, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwalt mannesmann plastics machinery GmbH FS Krauss-Maffei Strasse 2 80997 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/30] | Wilhelm, Ludwig (DE) mpm consulting & services GmbH Patentabteilung FS, Krauss-Maffei-Str. 2 80997 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/18] | Wilhelm, Ludwig Dipl.-Ing., Patentanwalt Mannesmann Plastics Machinery AG, ZS, Krauss-Maffei Strasse 2 80997 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02020361.8 | 12.09.2002 | [2003/18] | Priority number, date | DE2001152625 | 25.10.2001 Original published format: DE 10152625 | [2003/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1306186 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1306186 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/16, B29C45/17, B29C45/04 | [2003/18] | CPC: |
B29C45/1742 (EP,US);
B29C45/045 (EP,US);
B29C45/1628 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU [2004/04] |
Former [2003/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verstellbare Dreheinrichtung für Horizontal-Spritzgiessmaschinen | [2003/18] | English: | Adjustable rotating unit for horizontal injection molding machine | [2003/18] | French: | Tourelle ajustable pour une machine a mouler par injection horizontale | [2003/18] | Examination procedure | 09.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/18] | 23.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/38] | IT | 30.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS6260618 ; | [Y]US1571557 (PAUL WILLIAM L) [Y] 1-5 * column 1, line 10 - line 14; figures 1-3; claim 1 *; | [Y]US2860015 (DUNSFORTH MATTERSON PETER) [Y] 1-5 * column 1, line 26 - line 24 *; | [A]DE1942259 (PRUEFER PETER) [A] 1-3 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE2132432 (MICKE MANFRED) [A] 1-3 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]GB1437392 (HASENCLEVER R, et al) [A] 1-3 * figures 11-13,18,20 *; | [A]DE3140711 (KOEPPERN & CO KG MASCHF [DE]) [A] 1-3 * figures 2,4 *; | [A]US5409656 (NARUSE TAKAHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-3* figures 1,6,7 *; | [Y]EP0743156 (KRAUSS MAFFEI AG [DE]) [Y] 1-5 * figures 2-4; claim 1 *; | [DY]WO0110624 (KRAUSS MAFFEI KUNSTSTOFFTECH [DE], et al) [DY] 1-5 * the whole document * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870814), vol. 011, no. 250, Database accession no. (M - 616), & JP62060618 A 19870317 (JAPAN STEEL WORKS LTD:THE) [Y] 1-3,5 * abstract * |