EP1292159 - Base station supporting multi-sector/multi-frequency assignment for seamles call service [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.11.2006 [2006/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/48] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City Kyungki-do / KR | ||
Former [2003/11] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kweon, Seong-Joon 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-city, Kyungki-do / KR | [2003/11] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02020439.2 | 11.09.2002 | [2003/11] | Priority number, date | KR20010055840 | 11.09.2001 Original published format: KR 2001055840 | KR20010088389 | 29.12.2001 Original published format: KR 2001088389 | [2003/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1292159 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1292159 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/30 | [2003/11] | CPC: |
H04W88/08 (EP,US);
H04W24/04 (EP,US);
H04W72/0453 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/49] |
Former [2003/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Basisstation mit Unterstützung von Multisektor-/Multifrequenzzuordnung für unterbrechungsfreie Anrufdienste | [2003/11] | English: | Base station supporting multi-sector/multi-frequency assignment for seamles call service | [2003/11] | French: | Station de base supportant l'allocation multisectorielle/multifréquence pour des services d'appel sans interruption | [2003/11] | Examination procedure | 11.09.2002 | Examination requested [2003/11] | 12.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5854813 (ROTTINGHAUS ALAN P [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * column 3, lines 9-67 * * column 5, lines 13-47 *; | [Y]DE19755379 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1-19 * column 3, lines 27-36 * * column 4, lines 48-67 * * column 7, lines 5-22 *; | [Y]US6009130 (LUREY DANIEL M [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * figures 1-3,12,13 * * column 4, lines 35-47 * * column 5, lines 1-6 * * column 6, lines 1-25,37-49,66,67 * * column 7, lines 42-63 *; | [A] - "N+M RADIO SECTOR FLEXIBLE REDUNDANCY FOR POINT-TO-MULTIPOINT SYSTEMS", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, KENNETH MASON PUBLICATIONS, HAMPSHIRE, GB, (199905), no. 421, ISSN 0374-4353, pages 658 - 659, XP000888728 [A] 1-19 * page 2 * |