EP1294006 - Display device and method of driving display panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.11.2007 [2007/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states Pioneer Display Products Corporation 15-1, Aza-Nishinoya Washizu Fukuroi-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/45] | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Pioneer Display Products Corporation 15-1, Aza-Nishinoya Washizu Fukuroi-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | |||
Former [2003/12] | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Shizuoka Pioneer Corporation 15-1, Nishinoya, Washizu Fukuroi-shi, Shizuoka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tokunaga, Tsutomu, Shizuoka Pioneer Corporation Koufu Plant, 2680, Nishihanawa, Tatomi-cho Nakakoma-gun, Yamanashi / JP | 02 /
Saegusa, Nobuhiko, Shizuoka Pioneer Corporation Koufu Plant, 2680, Nishihanawa, Tatomi-cho Nakakoma-gun, Yamanashi / JP | 03 /
Yahagi, Kazuo, Shizuoka Pioneer Corporation Koufu Plant, 2680, Nishihanawa, Tatomi-cho Nakakoma-gun, Yamanashi / JP | 04 /
Kitagawa, Mitsushi, Shizuoka Pioneer Corporation Koufu Plant, 2680, Nishihanawa, Tatomi-cho Nakakoma-gun, Yamanashi / JP | 05 /
Suzue, Ryo, Shizuoka Pioneer Corporation Koufu Plant, 2680, Nishihanawa, Tatomi-cho Nakakoma-gun, Yamanashi / JP | 06 /
Otani, Eishiro, Shizuoka Pioneer Corporation Koufu Plant, 2680, Nishihanawa, Tatomi-cho Nakakoma-gun, Yamanashi / JP | 07 /
Sato, Yoichi, Shizuoka Pioneer Corporation Koufu Plant, 2680, Nishihanawa, Tatomi-cho Nakakoma-gun, Yamanashi / JP | [2003/12] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/12] | Betten & Resch Patentanwälte, Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02020452.5 | 11.09.2002 | [2003/12] | Priority number, date | JP20010279504 | 14.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001279504 | JP20020167802 | 07.06.2002 Original published format: JP 2002167802 | JP20020187466 | 27.06.2002 Original published format: JP 2002187466 | [2003/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1294006 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1294006 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | [2005/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01J17/16, H01J17/49, H01J5/02, G09G3/28 | [2003/12] | CPC: |
G09G3/2927 (EP,US);
G09G3/291 (KR);
G09G3/2922 (EP,US);
G09G3/2925 (EP,US);
G09G3/293 (EP,US);
G09G3/2932 (EP,US);
G09G3/2935 (EP,US);
G09G3/2937 (EP,US);
G09G3/296 (KR);
G09G3/2983 (EP,US);
G09G3/2986 (EP,US);
G09G3/299 (EP,US);
H01J11/12 (EP,US);
H01J11/24 (EP,US);
H01J11/34 (KR);
H01J11/36 (EP,US);
H01J11/38 (EP,US);
H01J11/44 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/31] |
Former [2003/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Anzeigevorrichtung und Verfahren zur Ansteuerung einer Anzeigetafel | [2003/12] | English: | Display device and method of driving display panel | [2003/12] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage et procédé de commande d'un panneau d'affichage | [2003/12] | Examination procedure | 04.11.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/21] | 08.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2001011871 (AMEMIYA KIMIO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6-9,11,13,17,29,37,51 * paragraphs [0197] - [0224] * * figures 10,11,17-19,23 *; | [E]EP1276131 (PIONEER CORP [JP], et al) [E] 1,3,4,6-9,11,13,17,29,37,51 * paragraphs [0143] - [0147] * * figures 5,6 *; | [PX]EP1326263 (PIONEER CORP [JP], et al) [PX] 1,3,4,6-9,11,13,17,29,37,51 * paragraphs [0059] - [0097] ** figures 1,2 * |