EP1293324 - Filter for injection moulding machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210, Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/48] | For all designated states Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 210, Nakanuma, Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | ||
Former [2003/12] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210,Nakanuma, Minami-ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suehara, Kazuyoshi 210 Nakanuma Minami.ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Tominaga, Yoshihiro 210 Nakanuma Minami-ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Iwazaki, Nobuyuki 210 Nakanuma Minami-ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [2003/12] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/12] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02020505.0 | 12.09.2002 | [2003/12] | Priority number, date | JP20010277030 | 12.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001277030 | [2003/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1293324 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1293324 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/24 | [2003/12] | CPC: |
B29C45/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, NL [2003/50] |
Former [2003/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Filter für Spritzgiessmaschine | [2003/12] | English: | Filter for injection moulding machine | [2003/12] | French: | Filtre pour presse à injecter | [2003/12] | Examination procedure | 25.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/26] | 10.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, SE, SK, TR | 13.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.10.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2003 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2003 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2003 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.10.2003 | SK   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 24.11.2004 | [2006/14] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH10217281 ; | [XY]US3767056 (NEUMAN G) [X] 6,7 * column 2, line 37 - line 46 * * column 3, line 24 - line 34 * * the whole document * [Y] 4-6; | [XY] - SIEBEINSATZ FUER VERSCHLUSSDUESEN, KUNSTSTOFFE, CARL HANSER VERLAG. MUNCHEN, DE, VOL. 88, NR. 6, PAGE(S) 799, ISSN 0023-5563, XP000766379 [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [Y] 4-6 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981130), vol. 1998, no. 13, & JP10217281 A 19980818 (TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA LTD) [A] 1-6 * abstract * | [A] - ROSSBACH R, SCHMELZEFILTER FUR DEN SPRITZGIESSER MELT FILTERS FOR INJECTION MOULDERS, KUNSTSTOFFE, CARL HANSER VERLAG. MUNCHEN, DE, VOL. 85, NR. 2, PAGE(S) 193-195, ISSN 0023-5563, XP000487988 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * |