EP1293719 - Device for filling a spreading vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2005 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.05.2005 [2005/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Titus Wintermantel GmbH Dögginger Strasse 17 78199 Bräunlingen / DE | [2003/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wintermantel, Titus Dögginger Strasse 17 78199 Bräunlingen / DE | 02 /
Kukoschke, Karl-Gustav, Dr. Karlsbrunner Strasse 3 38116 Braunschweig / DE | [2003/12] | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/12] | Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Waldstrasse 33 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Application number, filing date | 02020635.5 | 13.09.2002 | [2003/12] | Priority number, date | DE2001215170U | 13.09.2001 Original published format: DE 20115170 U | [2003/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1293719 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1293719 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | [2004/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16L55/10, F16L37/32, F16L29/00, B67D5/32 | [2003/12] | CPC: |
B67D7/3218 (EP);
F16L29/00 (EP);
F16L37/32 (EP);
F16L55/1007 (EP);
F16L2201/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/43] |
Former [2003/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Betanken eines Streufahrzeuges | [2003/12] | English: | Device for filling a spreading vehicle | [2003/12] | French: | Dispositif pour le remplissage d'une épandeuse | [2003/12] | Examination procedure | 29.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/19] | 01.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/19] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.09.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 13.09.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 13.09.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE953856 (VOGEL WILLY FA) [Y] 2 * figures 2-4 *; | [XY]US5597020 (MILLER CHARLES E [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 5, line 63 - column 6, line 4 * [Y] 2,3; | [Y]GB2342709 (RISBRIDGER LIMITED [GB]) [Y] 3* abstract * |