EP1312297 - Dishwasher [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electrolux Home Products Corporation N.V. Belgicastraat 17 1930 Zaventem / BE | [2003/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brendgens, Lothar Lindenstrasse 44c 91126 Schwabach / DE | [2003/21] | Representative(s) | Baumgartl, Gerhard Willi Electrolux Rothenburg GmbH Factory and Development 90327 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [N/P] | Baumgartl, Gerhard Willi AEG Hausgeräte GmbH Group Intellectual Property 90327 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [2003/21] | Baumgartl, Gerhard Willi AEG Hausgeräte GmbH, Patente, Marken & Lizenzen 90327 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 02020716.3 | 14.09.2002 | [2003/21] | Priority number, date | DE2001155903 | 14.11.2001 Original published format: DE 10155903 | [2003/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1312297 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1312297 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | [2006/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1312297 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A47L15/42, A47L15/23, A47L15/50, A47L15/16 | [2006/09] | CPC: |
A47L15/4219 (EP);
A47L15/16 (EP);
A47L15/23 (EP);
A47L15/508 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2003/21] | A47L15/42, A47L15/23 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2006/45] |
Former [2003/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Geschirrspülmaschine | [2003/21] | English: | Dishwasher | [2003/21] | French: | Lave-vaisselle | [2003/21] | Examination procedure | 08.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/30] | 25.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2355271 (LICENTIA GMBH) [A] 1-10 * page 3, line 26 - page 5, line 6; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0401767 (ZANUSSI A SPA INDUSTRIE [IT]) [A] 1-10 * column 4 - column 6; figures 2-6 *; | [A]WO9802082 (ARCELIK AS [TR], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 1 - page 2; figures 5,6 *; | [A]EP0943281 (WHITE CONSOLIDATED IND INC [US]) [A] 1,5-10* paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0023]; figure 3 * |