EP1306283 - Method for operating a communiction system for trains [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 18.08.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DB Regio AG Stephensonstrasse 1 60326 Frankfurt / DE | For all designated states DB Reise & Touristik AG Stephensonstrasse 1 60326 Frankfurt / DE | [2003/27] |
Former [2003/18] | For all designated states Deutsche Bahn AG Potsdamer Platz 2 10785 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Witte, Stefan, Dr. Flamingowerg 13a 32425 Minden / DE | 02 /
Minde, Frank Stiftstrasse 37 31688 Nienstädt / DE | [2003/18] | Representative(s) | Zinken-Sommer, Rainer Deutsche Bahn AG HLM 4 - Patentabteilung Richelstrasse 3 80634 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Zinken-Sommer, Rainer Deutsche Bahn AG Patentabteilung Völckerstrasse 5 80939 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/18] | Zinken-Sommer, Rainer Deutsche Bahn AG Patentabteilung TZ 02 Völckerstrasse 5 80939 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02020844.3 | 18.09.2002 | [2003/18] | Priority number, date | DE2001152965 | 26.10.2001 Original published format: DE 10152965 | [2003/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1306283 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1306283 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | [2003/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1306283 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B61L15/00 | [2003/18] | CPC: |
B61L15/0036 (EP);
B60L3/12 (EP);
B61L15/0072 (EP);
B61L25/028 (EP);
B60L2200/26 (EP);
B60L2240/70 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/18] | Extension states | AL | 04.12.2003 | LT | 04.12.2003 | LV | 04.12.2003 | MK | 04.12.2003 | RO | 04.12.2003 | SI | 04.12.2003 | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Betreiben eines Kommunikationsystems für Züge | [2003/18] | English: | Method for operating a communiction system for trains | [2003/18] | French: | Procédé de fonctionnement d'un système de communication pour trains | [2003/18] | Examination procedure | 24.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 04.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.02.2005
02.03.2005
WITHDRAWN Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.02.2005
02.03.2005
WITHDRAWN SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.02.2005
02.03.2005
WITHDRAWN Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.02.2005
02.03.2005
ADMISSIBLE Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | 28.09.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.11.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 02.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 12.05.2006 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2006/38] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 19.05.2004 | CY | 19.05.2004 | CZ | 19.05.2004 | EE | 19.05.2004 | FI | 19.05.2004 | GB | 19.05.2004 | IE | 19.05.2004 | IT | 19.05.2004 | SK | 19.05.2004 | TR | 19.05.2004 | DK | 19.08.2004 | GR | 19.08.2004 | ES | 30.08.2004 | LU | 18.09.2004 | MC | 30.09.2004 | PT | 19.10.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/38] | BG | 19.05.2004 | |
CY | 19.05.2004 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2004 | ||
EE | 19.05.2004 | ||
FI | 19.05.2004 | ||
GB | 19.05.2004 | ||
IE | 19.05.2004 | ||
IT | 19.05.2004 | ||
SK | 19.05.2004 | ||
TR | 19.05.2004 | ||
DK | 19.08.2004 | ||
GR | 19.08.2004 | ||
ES | 30.08.2004 | ||
LU | 18.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2007/10] | BG | 19.05.2004 | |
CY | 19.05.2004 | ||
CZ | 19.05.2004 | ||
EE | 19.05.2004 | ||
FI | 19.05.2004 | ||
GB | 19.05.2004 | ||
IE | 19.05.2004 | ||
SK | 19.05.2004 | ||
TR | 19.05.2004 | ||
DK | 19.08.2004 | ||
GR | 19.08.2004 | ||
ES | 30.08.2004 | ||
LU | 18.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2007/03] | BG | 19.05.2004 | |
CZ | 19.05.2004 | ||
EE | 19.05.2004 | ||
FI | 19.05.2004 | ||
GB | 19.05.2004 | ||
IE | 19.05.2004 | ||
SK | 19.05.2004 | ||
TR | 19.05.2004 | ||
DK | 19.08.2004 | ||
GR | 19.08.2004 | ||
ES | 30.08.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2006/52] | BG | 19.05.2004 | |
CZ | 19.05.2004 | ||
FI | 19.05.2004 | ||
GB | 19.05.2004 | ||
IE | 19.05.2004 | ||
SK | 19.05.2004 | ||
TR | 19.05.2004 | ||
DK | 19.08.2004 | ||
GR | 19.08.2004 | ||
ES | 30.08.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | BG | 19.05.2004 | |
CZ | 19.05.2004 | ||
FI | 19.05.2004 | ||
GB | 19.05.2004 | ||
IE | 19.05.2004 | ||
SK | 19.05.2004 | ||
DK | 19.08.2004 | ||
GR | 19.08.2004 | ||
ES | 30.08.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/30] | BG | 19.05.2004 | |
CZ | 19.05.2004 | ||
FI | 19.05.2004 | ||
IE | 19.05.2004 | ||
SK | 19.05.2004 | ||
DK | 19.08.2004 | ||
GR | 19.08.2004 | ||
ES | 30.08.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | CZ | 19.05.2004 | |
FI | 19.05.2004 | ||
IE | 19.05.2004 | ||
SK | 19.05.2004 | ||
DK | 19.08.2004 | ||
GR | 19.08.2004 | ||
ES | 30.08.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/19] | CZ | 19.05.2004 | |
FI | 19.05.2004 | ||
IE | 19.05.2004 | ||
SK | 19.05.2004 | ||
DK | 19.08.2004 | ||
GR | 19.08.2004 | ||
ES | 30.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | CZ | 19.05.2004 | |
FI | 19.05.2004 | ||
SK | 19.05.2004 | ||
DK | 19.08.2004 | ||
GR | 19.08.2004 | ||
ES | 30.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | CZ | 19.05.2004 | |
FI | 19.05.2004 | ||
SK | 19.05.2004 | ||
GR | 19.08.2004 | ||
ES | 30.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/12] | FI | 19.05.2004 | |
SK | 19.05.2004 | ||
GR | 19.08.2004 | ||
ES | 30.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | FI | 19.05.2004 | |
GR | 19.08.2004 | ||
ES | 30.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 19.05.2004 | |
ES | 30.08.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1013533 (DEUTSCHE BAHN AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 52 - column 3, line 32 *; | [A] - ZUR BONSEN G A, "The Multifunction Vehicle Bus (MVB)", FACTORY COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS, 1995. WFCS '95, PROCEEDINGS., 1995 IEEE INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON LEYSIN, SWITZERLAND 4-6 OCT. 1995, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19951004), ISBN 0-7803-3059-5, pages 27 - 34, XP010154281 [A] 1 * page 27, column 1, paragraph 2 - page 28, column 2, paragraph 4 * | [A] - NIEVA T ET AL, "Jini technology applied to railway systems", INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON DISTRIBUTED OBJECTS AND APPLICATIONS, PROCEEDINGS DOA'00, Antwerp, Belgium, (20000921), pages 251 - 259, XP010514377 [A] 2,3 * page 251, column 1, paragraph 2 - page 254, column 2, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/DOA.2000.874197 |