EP1266616 - Fingerprint image generating method and fingerprint image recording sheet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.07.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.09.2005 [2005/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0123 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/51] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa 250-01 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chikami, Nozomu Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 200, Onakazato Fujinomiya, Shizuoka / JP | [2002/51] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/51] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02021299.9 | 30.04.1996 | [2002/51] | Priority number, date | JP19950128769 | 01.05.1995 Original published format: JP 12876995 | [2002/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1266616 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/117 | [2002/51] | CPC: |
A61B5/1172 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/51] | Title | German: | Bilddarstelungsverfahren und Aufzeichnungsvorrichtung für Fingerabdrücke | [2002/51] | English: | Fingerprint image generating method and fingerprint image recording sheet | [2002/51] | French: | Procédé d'imagerie et support destinés à l'enregistrement d'empreintes digitales | [2002/51] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/12] | 25.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/37] | 12.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/37] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96106856.6 / EP0740924 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2005 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4232083 (BUERKLEY DONALD D, et al) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 6 - line 59 ** column 6, line 59 - column 8, line 45 * | Examination | JPS5615392 | US2500612 | US4943089 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810424), vol. 005, no. 061, Database accession no. (M - 065), & JPS5615392 A 19810214 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) | by applicant | US4002060 | US4132112 | JPS5724852 | JPS5916654 |