EP1298314 - Fuel accumulator for an injection system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2003/14] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taudt, Christian Nürnberger Strasse 343 93059 Regensburg / DE | 02 /
Wirkowski, Michael Laerchenweg 5 93055 Regensburg / DE | [2003/14] | Application number, filing date | 02021546.3 | 26.09.2002 | [2003/14] | Priority number, date | DE2001148009 | 28.09.2001 Original published format: DE 10148009 | [2003/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1298314 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1298314 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F02M55/02, F16L55/11 | [2003/14] | CPC: |
F02M55/025 (EP);
F16L55/11 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/01] |
Former [2003/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kraftstoffspeicher für eine Einspritzvorrichtung | [2003/14] | English: | Fuel accumulator for an injection system | [2003/14] | French: | Accumulateur de combustible pour un dispositif d'injection | [2003/14] | Examination procedure | 17.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/25] | 22.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 26.11.2008 | [2011/14] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3406948 (PREMATECHNIK GES FUER VERFAHRE [DE]) [A] 1-3,5,14 * page 7, line 28 - page 8, line 7; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0781700 (TORRINGTON CO [US]) [A] 1,2,4,6,14,15* column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 48; figures 3,4 *; | [X]EP0866221 (POPPE & POTTHOFF GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,6,12-15 * column 5, line 5 - line 38; figure 9 *; | [X]EP0886066 (SIEMENS AUTOMOTIVE CORP LP [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6,14 * column 3, line 21 - column 4, line 23; figures 1-3 * | by applicant | DE19729392 |