Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1408178 | Global Dossier | 05.09.2007 | B1 | EP1408178 | 14.04.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP02021595 | 27.09.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE372434T | 15.09.2007 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP02021595 | 27.09.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50210854D1 | 18.10.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP02021595 | 27.09.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1408178T | 04.02.2008 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP02021595 | 27.09.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2294072T | 01.04.2008 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP02021595 | 27.09.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1408178E | 16.11.2007 | E | Priority number | Date | EP02021595 | 27.09.2002 |